Acosta v. Beck Facility Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Fernando Cuevas Acosta
Defendant: Beck Facility Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05221
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Beck Facility Services, LLC Answer due 1/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/2/2020. (bdb)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (with Consent) by Beck Facility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Natalie)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Beck Facility Services, LLC Answer due 1/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 12/12/2019. (tcc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Jensen on behalf of Beck Facility Services, LLC (Jensen, Amy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Beck Facility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, Natalie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Fernando Cuevas Acosta. Beck Facility Services, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Blackburn, Calvin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Beck Facility Services, LLC. (jap)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Fernando Cuevas Acosta (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9104668). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Beck Facility Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Cuevas Acosta
Represented By: Calvin Weis Blackburn, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beck Facility Services, LLC
Represented By: Natalie Nicole Turner
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?