Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Hip City Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Stone Diamond Music Corp. and Amazement Music
Defendant: Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC and Denisha Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv05284
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC. (ah)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harley, Gregory)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this action is STAYED only with respect to all claims against Defendant Denisha Johnson until further order. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/31/2019. (anc)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Acknowledgment by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harley, Gregory)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp.. (Jones, Kwende)
November 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #7 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (anc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (anc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Harley, Gregory)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Denisha Johnson. (sap)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC. (sap)
November 22, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ah)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp. Denisha Johnson, individually (Harley, Gregory)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp. Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC d/b/a Route 66 Restaurant & Venue (Harley, Gregory)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Amazement Music, Hip City Music, Inc. and Hifrost Publishing (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9114032). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule, #2 Summons Incorrect, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory F. Harley
Represented By: Kwende B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hip City Music, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory F. Harley
Represented By: Kwende B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hifrost Publishing
Represented By: Gregory F. Harley
Represented By: Kwende B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp.
Represented By: Gregory F. Harley
Represented By: Kwende B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazement Music
Represented By: Gregory F. Harley
Represented By: Kwende B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Route 66 Restaurant & Venue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denisha Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?