Citizens Trust Bank v. Monroe
Plaintiff: Citizens Trust Bank
Defendant: Marva M. Monroe and Marva Melissa Monroe El
Case Number: 1:2019cv05402
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 Receipt of Electronic Filing of the #9 Order of Remand with the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (jpa)
January 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marva M. Monroe re #9 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jpa)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER adopting #5 Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this case to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia and DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/14/20. (jpa)
January 14, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
January 6, 2020 Submission of #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY BRIEF re #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Notice of Removal, filed by Marva M. Monroe filed by Citizens Trust Bank. (McBryan, Louis)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appeal construed by clerk as OBJECTIONS to #5 Report and Recommendation filed by Marva M. Monroe. (bnp)
December 17, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marva M. Monroe re #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jpa)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/17/19. (jpa)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order (Found in #5 R&R) ORDER denying #3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/17/19. (jpa)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Notice of Removal. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/17/19. (jpa)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Marva M. Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 17, 2019 Submission of #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (jpa)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marva M. Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(jpa)
December 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marva M. Monroe re #2 Order (jpa)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DENYING the #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Defendant still wishes to proceed IFP, she is DIRECTED to provide the Court with an amended IFP application that contains the requisite information within TEN DAYS of the date of this Order. Should Defendant wish to proceed with this action without submitting an amended IFP application, she MUST pay the appropriate filing fee to the Clerk of Court within TEN DAYS of the date of this Order. If Defendant fails to either submit an amended IFP application that contains the requisite information or fails to pay the appropriate filing fee by Friday, December 13, 2019, I will recommend that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/3/19. (jpa)
December 3, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (jpa)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marva M. Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Trust Bank v. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marva M. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marva Melissa Monroe El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Trust Bank
Represented By: Louis G. McBryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?