Byers v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: George A. Byers
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, BNY Mellon, HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A. and Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05406
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George A. Byers re #8 Order. (dmb)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #4 Motion to Stay. The deadlines for the parties to complete theRule 26(f) early planning conference, serve the Initial Disclosures, and file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan are STAYED until 30 days after the District Court issues a final ruling on the Motion to Dismiss #5 , unless such ruling is dispositive of all claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/2/2020. (dmb)
December 26, 2019 Submission of #3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #4 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (rlb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNY Mellon, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for BNY Mellon. (Anderson, Keith)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by BNY Mellon, Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Anderson, Keith)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Rhadans, Allison)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Discovery with Brief In Support by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhadans, Allison)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhadans, Allison)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Bank of America N.A.. (Rhadans, Allison)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9133129). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byers v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNY Mellon
Represented By: Keith Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank, U.S.A., N.A.
Represented By: Alan D. Leeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Represented By: Allison Giardina Rhadans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?