Clarendon National Insurance Company v. Glickauf et al
Plaintiff: Clarendon National Insurance Company and Companion Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M. Darroch and Stephanie Glickauf
Petitioner: National Claims Services, Inc. and Venture Underwriters, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05783
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Refund in the amount of $150.00 has been processed, effective 1/22/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
January 21, 2020 Clerks Approval re #88 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
January 17, 2020 Filing 88 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-9274294. (Frisch, Eric)
January 17, 2020 RETURN of #87 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Steinmetz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9274294). to attorney. (pmb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 87 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert Steinmetz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9274294).by Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Pulkrabek and Jaworsky re #86 Order. (dob)
January 8, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER directing the Clerk to TERMINATE this matter as duplicative of previously-transferred case Clarendon National Insurance Company v. Glickauf, No. 1:19-cv-01967-MLB (N.D. Ga.). All future filings shall be done in the previously-transferred case. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/8/2020. (dob)
January 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ross Whiting Pulkrabek and Todd Evan Jaworsky re #85 Order Reassigning Case. (jpa)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Eleanor L. Ross no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-5783-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/7/20. (jpa)
January 6, 2020 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Persons by Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Hughes, Ashley)
December 27, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Ross W. Pulkrabek and Todd E. Jaworsky as to Clarendon National Insurance Company, Companion Specialty Insurance Company, National Claims Services, Inc. and Venture Underwriters, Inc. regarding #83 Order. (mlb)
December 27, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
December 26, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Hughes on behalf of Robert M. Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP (Hughes, Ashley)
December 26, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE by Goodman McGuffey, LLP of Withdrawal of Secondary Counsel (Katz, Amy)
December 26, 2019 Filing 80 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-02549. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Objection (Doc. #73 ) to the Order by United States Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is OVERRULED; The Order of Magistrate Judge Wang (Doc. #71 ) is AFFIRMED; Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Doc. #36 ) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' action shall remain transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/23/2019.(evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 78 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to #73 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO ORDER ON MOTION TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. #74) filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying #75 Motion for Hearing on Plaintiff's Objection to Order on Motion Transfer Venue (Doc. # 73). Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company is directed to file a five-page reply brief addressing Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection (Doc. #74) on or before Tuesday, June 11, 2019, at 5:00 PM (MT). In addition to the five-page limitation, Plaintiff shall file its reply brief in compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1 and the Court's Civil Practice Standards. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/4/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #73 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court TO ORDER ON MOTION TRANSFER VENUE by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 74 RESPONSE to #73 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (McConnell, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 73 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #71 Order on Motion to Transfer Venue by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) Modified on 5/18/2019 to correct event and create linkage (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 72 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia in Atlanta, at InterdistrictTransfer_GAND@gand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (nmarb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #36 Motion To Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/1/19.(nmarb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Walter N. Houghtaling on behalf of Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLPAttorney Walter N. Houghtaling added to party Robert M Darroch(pty:dft), Attorney Walter N. Houghtaling added to party Stephanie Glickauf(pty:dft), Attorney Walter N. Houghtaling added to party Goodman McGuffey, LLP(pty:dft) (Houghtaling, Walter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service PLAINTIFF CLARENDON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO NONPARTIES by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 3/28/2019, to file a Motion to Quash Defendants' subpoenas or other related motion if necessary. Counsel are reminded that all motions seeking an extension of time must comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) as future noncompliance may result in this court striking the motion without substantive consideration. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/14/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM regarding #65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO NONPARTIES filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/14/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 66 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO NONPARTIES filed by attorney George D. Yaron. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE A MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ISSUED TO NONPARTIES by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Non-parties National Claims Services, Inc. and Venture Underwriters, Inc. shall respond to Defendants' subpoenas on or before 4/18/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/13/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM regarding #62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Subpoenas filed by National Claims Services, Inc., Venture Underwriters, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/13/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Subpoenas by Movants National Claims Services, Inc., Venture Underwriters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jaworsky, Todd) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to #57 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (McConnell, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE to #57 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Dessel Katz on behalf of Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLPAttorney Amy Dessel Katz added to party Robert M Darroch(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Dessel Katz added to party Stephanie Glickauf(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Dessel Katz added to party Goodman McGuffey, LLP(pty:dft) (Katz, Amy) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM regarding #57 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/19/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/14/2019. Defendants' Motion to Stay #38 is DENIED. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Designation of NonParties at Fault by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER: Before this court are two Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants. Given the procedural posture of this matter, and to make briefing on the Motions to Dismiss more cohesive for both this court and the presiding judge, the Honorable Christine M. Arguello, this court STRIKES #35 Motion to Dismiss and #51 Motion to Dismiss in lieu of a consolidated Motion that combines both Motions to Dismiss, but does not raise any new, amended, and/or modified arguments. Defendants shall file this consolidated Motion to Dismiss on or before Friday, 2/15/2019. Plaintiff shall then file a consolidated Response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before 3/1/2019, and Defendants shall file their Reply on or before 3/8/2019. No extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/13/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM regarding #51 Second MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/12/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response in Support of #35 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. PRO. 12 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Frisch, Eric) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct event text and create linkage (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 51 Second MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response In Support of #36 Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1391 and 1406 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct event text and create linkage (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT JURY TRIAL DEMANDED ON ISSUES TRIABLE TO JURY against All Defendants, filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint #46 . The court construes the Motion as an amendment by consent under Local Rule 15.1(a) and ACCEPTS it as such. Plaintiff shall docket the Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry on or before 1/30/2019. Furthermore, this court will consider the pending Motions to Dismiss [ #35 , #36 ] as aimed towards the Second Amended Complaint unless otherwise directed by Defendants. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/29/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM regarding #46 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/29/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redlined First Amended Complaint)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE to #36 MOTION for Order to Transfer Venue and Brief In Support filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Paul Amirata, #10 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #11 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #12 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #13 Exhibit C - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #14 Exhibit D - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #15 Exhibit E - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #16 Exhibit F - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #17 Exhibit G - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #18 Exhibit H - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #19 Exhibit I - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #20 Exhibit J - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #21 Exhibit K - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #22 Exhibit L - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino, #23 Exhibit M - Declaration of Jenna E. Settino)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 (b)(6) filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE to #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery UNDER FED R. CIV. P. 26(c)(1) filed by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER re: #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Plaintiff shall file its Response on or before 1/22/2019; Defendants' Reply, if any, is due on or before 1/29/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/8/2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/8/2019. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/8/2019. Motion for Protective Order #32 is GRANTED; and A Protective Order, consistent with this Order, is ENTERED concurrently withthis Order. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM regarding #38 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/8/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM regarding #36 MOTION for Order to Transfer Venue and Brief In Support filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch, #35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/8/2019. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Order to Transfer Venue and Brief In Support by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PRO. 12 by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to designate non-parties at fault is hereby EXTENDED to February 15, 2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/20/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM regarding #32 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/20/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM regarding #30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Nonparty Deadline filed by Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, Robert M Darroch. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/20/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Nonparty Deadline by Defendants Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McConnell, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. McConnell on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Robert M Darroch(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Stephanie Glickauf(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Goodman McGuffey, LLP(pty:dft) (McConnell, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/12/2018. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 27 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Designation of Affirmative Experts due 9/30/2019. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 10/30/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ross Whiting Pulkrabek on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company, Companion Specialty Insurance CompanyAttorney Ross Whiting Pulkrabek added to party Clarendon National Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Ross Whiting Pulkrabek added to party Companion Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Pulkrabek, Ross) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert M Darroch, Stephanie Glickauf, Goodman McGuffey, LLP, filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint #22 . The court construes the Motion as an amendment by consent under Local Rule 15.1(a) and ACCEPTS it as such. Plaintiff shall docket the First Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry on or before 12.12.2019. Also in the Motion is a stipulation that Defendant has thirty days to file a responsive pleading [Id. at 2]. The Court construes this as the parties' one stipulated extension of time under Local Rule 6.1(a) and ACCEPTS it as such. Defendant shall have thirty days from the filing of the First Amended Complaint to Answer or otherwise respond. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12.9.2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify COMPLAINT filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/7/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline of Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit E to Amended Complaint, #8 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt 1 Amended Complaint Strike Through/underline, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Amended Complaint)(Settino, Jenna) Modified on 12/7/2018 to note that this document was re-filed as doc #22 (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF REVIEW by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Jenna E. Settino on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance CompanyAttorney Jenna E. Settino added to party Clarendon National Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Settino, Jenna) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #15 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Eric Jeffrey Frisch. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Jeffrey Frisch on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Eric Jeffrey Frisch added to party Robert M Darroch(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Jeffrey Frisch added to party Stephanie Glickauf(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Jeffrey Frisch added to party Goodman McGuffey, LLP(pty:dft) (Frisch, Eric) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/9/18 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Goodman McGuffey, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Robert M. Darroch, #2 Summons as to Stephanie Glickauf) (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/9/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02549-CMA. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Exercising my prerogative as a Senior Judge, I request that this civil action be reassigned. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to STEPHANIE GLICKAUF by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to ROBERT M. DARROCH by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to GOODMAN MCGUFFEY, LLP by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued, All parties must be listed on the caption of the Summons. The Summons provided only list the first Plaintiff. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Clarendon National Insurance Company for Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff Clarendon National Insurance Company (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance OF COUNSEL by George D. Yaron on behalf of Clarendon National Insurance Company (Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT JURY DEMAND against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6329282)Attorney George D. Yaron added to party Clarendon National Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibt A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Summons All Defendants, #9 Summons Summons of Robert M. Darroch, #10 Summons Summons of Goodman McGuffey LLP, #11 Summons Summons of Stephanie Glickauf)(Yaron, George) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarendon National Insurance Company v. Glickauf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman McGuffey, LLP
Represented By: Ashley Hughes
Represented By: Eric Jeffrey Frisch
Represented By: Michael T. McConnell
Represented By: Amy Dessel Katz
Represented By: Walter N. Houghtaling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Darroch
Represented By: Ashley Hughes
Represented By: Eric Jeffrey Frisch
Represented By: Michael T. McConnell
Represented By: Amy Dessel Katz
Represented By: Walter N. Houghtaling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Glickauf
Represented By: Ashley Hughes
Represented By: Eric Jeffrey Frisch
Represented By: Michael T. McConnell
Represented By: Amy Dessel Katz
Represented By: Walter N. Houghtaling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Represented By: Ross Whiting Pulkrabek
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Jenna E. Settino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Companion Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ross Whiting Pulkrabek
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Claims Services, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Evan Jaworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Venture Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Evan Jaworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?