Washington v. U. S. A.
Plaintiff: Matthew Washington
Defendant: U. S. A.
Case Number: 1:2019mi00037
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), #3 Notice of Appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Matthew Washington failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 19-11012-B. (pjm)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 USCA Acknowledgment of #3 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Washington. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 19-11012-B. (pjm)
March 18, 2019 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #3 Notice of Appeal. (kac)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #3 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Washington. (kac)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order by Matthew Washington. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Fee Letter) (Appeal Fee Ltr sent to Plaintiff) (pc: USCA)(kac)
February 27, 2019 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (eop)
February 27, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Matthew Washington re #2 Order. (eop)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to CLOSE this miscellaneous action without creating a civil action. The Clerk shall not docket any further filings in the miscellaneous action except a notice of appeal which, if filed, shall be processed in the normal course. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/27/19. (eop)
February 20, 2019 Submission of #1 Proposed Complaint for Review, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (eop)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE Of Filing, Proposed Complaint by Matthew Washington (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. U. S. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?