PAX Water Technologies, Inc. et al v. Medora Corporation
Plaintiff: PSI Water Technologies, Inc. and PAX Water Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Medora Corporation
Petitioner: Utility Service Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019mi00101
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: Janet F King
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (eop)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing by Utility Service Company, Inc. re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, Order,,,, of Ruling re Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order (Marshall, David)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: Pending before the court is Movant Utility Service Co., Inc.'s ("USCI") motion to quash a subpoena duces tecum for appearance at a deposition scheduled for June 18, 2019, and for production of documents. Movant challenges service of the subpoena as well as the scope of the subpoena. Doc. 1. This matter arises out of litigation pending in the Central District of California, 2:18-cv-09143 JAK (AGRx), in which the Movant asserts a motion for protective order is pending regarding the issuance of 14 subpoenas including the subpoena duces tecum issued to the Movant and subject of the motion to quash. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that pending resolution of the motion for protective order pending in the Central District of California and further order of this court, Movant is relieved from responding to the document production or appearing for deposition in the Northern District of Georgia. Counsel are to advise the court upon resolution of the motion for protective order pending in the Central District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 6/17/19. (bnw)
June 14, 2019 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Service of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop)
June 12, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number AGANDC-8725135 (eop)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Service of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action and with Memorandum of Law In Support by Utility Service Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAX Water Technologies, Inc. et al v. Medora Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSI Water Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAX Water Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medora Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Utility Service Company, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?