Dorow et al v. Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. et al
Petitioner: William Griswold and Dale Dorow
Respondent: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd. and Philips North America LLC
Case Number: 1:2019mi00114
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Jean-Paul Boulee
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
2 Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. Case converted to. (ddm)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing the Clerk to terminate the referral to the undersigned and to file in civil action number 1:17-cv-2864-JPB the pending motion to quash, [Doc. 1], the response in opposition to the motion, [Doc. 11], and the reply, [Doc. 17], and to administratively close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 7/24/19. (ddm)
July 10, 2019 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties Dale Dorow and William Griswold or, in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4029500), to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (aar)
July 10, 2019 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 5:19-mc-00002. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 9, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Northern District of Georgia. Original electronic file and docket sheet sent. (nvc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Transfer Petitioner's Motion to Quash. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/9/2019. (nvc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION Transfer of Petitioners' Motion to Quash by Philips India, Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America, LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION Transfer of Petitioners' Motion to Quash by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. Replies due by 6/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Report and Request for Amendment to the Scheduling Order (NDGA 1:17-cv-2864))(Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Senior Judge Graham Mullen no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Quash or, in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. (Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION Transfer of Petitioners' Motion to Quash by Philips India, Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America, LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION Transfer of Petitioners' Motion to Quash by Philips India, Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America, LLC. Responses due by 6/18/2019 (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Notice to Christopher R. Brennan: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/11/2019. (nvc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 , #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kirsten R. Rydstrom and Christopher R. Brennan for Philips India, Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. and Philips North America, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/4/2019. (nvc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher R. Brennan Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4047247. by Philips India, Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America, LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kirsten R. Rydstrom Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4047235. by Philips India, Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America, LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties Dale Dorow and William Griswold or, in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4029500) by Philips India, Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America, LLC. Replies due by 6/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rydstrom Declaration, #2 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Rydstrom Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1: Initial Disclosures - Georgia Action, #4 Exhibit 2: TEC Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit 3: Transtate Discovery Responses, #6 Exhibit 4: Feb 26 2019 Kivus Email, #7 Exhibit 5: Apr 4 2019 Jackson Email, #8 Exhibit 6: Dorow Notice, #9 Exhibit 7: Griswold Notice, #10 Exhibit 8: Apr 23 2019 Brzezynski Letter, #11 Exhibit 9: Apr 2019 Rydstrom and Brzezynski Emails, #12 Exhibit 10: May 15 2019 Discovery Conference Transcript)(MacHarg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips India, Ltd. (MacHarg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. (MacHarg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips North America, LLC (MacHarg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg on behalf of Philips India, Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America, LLC (MacHarg, Jeffrey) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Notice to Lora A. Brzezynski: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 5/28/2019. (nvc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Lora A. Brzezynski for Dale Dorow and William Griswold. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/20/2019. (nvc) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Motion referred to David S. Cayer: #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties Dale Dorow and William Griswold or, in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order and #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lora A. Brzezynski (tmg) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen and referred to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lora A. Brzezynski Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4030574. by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. (Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Raynal, IV on behalf of Dale Dorow, William Griswold (Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Lora A. Brzezynski re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties Dale Dorow and William Griswold or, in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4029500) filed by Dale Dorow, William Griswold (Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties Dale Dorow and William Griswold or, in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4029500) by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Dale Dorow, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to William Griswold, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 10, 2019 Letter of Counsel to Hon. Leigh Martin May)(Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties Dale Dorow and William Griswold or, in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4029500), filed by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. Responses due by 5/30/2019 (Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorow et al v. Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Represented By: Christopher Robert Brennan
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Philips India Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Robert Brennan
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Christopher Robert Brennan
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Griswold
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Dorow
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?