Parker v. Jonesboro Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Shalnice Jeanett Parker
Defendant: Jonesboro Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00030
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rsh)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DUPLICATE FILING) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Compel Arbritation and Stay. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. The parties shall file a dismissal upon finalization of the arbitration documents. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/7/2020. (dmb) Modified on 2/7/2020 (dmb).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Pending Action, and hereby COMPELS Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant to binding arbitration. The instant litigation is hereby stayed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close this case. The parties shall file a dismissal upon finalization of the arbitration documents. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 2/7/20. (rsh)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Pending Action by Jonesboro Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Roberts, Char)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/6/2020. (dmb)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION Compel Arbitration with Brief In Support by Jonesboro Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss, Compel Arbitration and Stay Discovery, #2 Exhibit A - Arbitration Agreement 12/11/17, #3 Exhibit B - Arbitration Agreement 12/29/17, #4 Exhibit C - Arbitration Agreement 1/29/18, #5 Exhibit D - Arbitration Agreement 2/9/18)(Roberts, Char) . Added MOTION to Compel on 1/10/2020 (dmb).
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint within #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Jonesboro Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. Discovery ends on 6/1/2020. (Originally filed in State Court on 1/3/2020) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Jonesboro Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9231257) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Notice of Removal to Clayton County State Court, #4 Exhibit D - USDC Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Face Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Jonesboro Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Char Leigh Roberts
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalnice Jeanett Parker
Represented By: Mary Lynn Paulson
Represented By: Ryan M. Horn
Represented By: Jan Phillip Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?