Premier Concrete LLC et al v. Argos North America Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Premier Concrete LLC, Joy Woods and Keith Woods
Defendant: Elite Concrete Holdings, LLC, Thomas Concrete of South Carolina, Inc., Coastal Concrete Southeast II LLC, Cemex Southeast, LLC, Thomas Concrete of Georgia, Inc., Elite Concrete of SC, LLC, Argos North America Corp., Cemex Materials, LLC, Evans Concrete Holdings Inc., Cemex, Inc., Giant Cement Company, Holcim (US) Inc., Evans Concrete, L.L.C., Elite Concrete, LLC, Argos Ready Mix, LLC and Thomas Concrete, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00307
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Mark Ellis on behalf of Thomas Concrete of Georgia, Inc., Thomas Concrete of South Carolina, Inc., Thomas Concrete, Inc. (Ellis, Andrew)
March 2, 2020 Filing 69 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cemex Materials, LLC, Cemex Southeast, LLC, Cemex, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cemex Southeast Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent CEMEX, S.A.B. de C.V., Corporate Parent Cemex Espana S.A., Corporate Parent Cemex Corp., Corporate Parent Cemex Operaciones Mexico S.A. de C.V., Corporate Parent New Sunward Holding B.V., Corporate Parent CEMEX UK for Cemex Materials, LLC, Cemex Southeast, LLC, Cemex, Inc.. (McGibbon, James)
February 27, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Russell Hanthorn on behalf of Thomas Concrete of Georgia, Inc., Thomas Concrete of South Carolina, Inc., Thomas Concrete, Inc. (Hanthorn, Gregory)
February 26, 2020 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Standing Order (Hanthorn, Gregory)
February 24, 2020 Filing 66 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Argos USA LLC for Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC. (Allen, Meredith)
February 21, 2020 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Carreno, Kaitlin)
February 21, 2020 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (McGibbon, James)
February 21, 2020 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #45 Order, (Gorham, Patricia)
February 21, 2020 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Carellas, Theodore)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. It is ORDERED that the time for all Defendants to answer, move, plead, defend, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including April 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/20/2020. (jed)
February 20, 2020 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #45 Order, (Allen, Meredith)
February 20, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Helms, Tyner)
February 20, 2020 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Gould, C.)
February 20, 2020 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Keen, Benjamin)
February 20, 2020 Filing 56 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 10/16/20-10/26/20, by Benjamin Randall Keen. (Keen, Benjamin) Modified on 2/21/2020 to edit text (jed).
February 19, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Ann Carreno on behalf of Cemex Materials, LLC, Cemex Southeast, LLC, Cemex, Inc. (Carreno, Kaitlin)
February 19, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. McGibbon on behalf of Cemex Materials, LLC, Cemex Southeast, LLC, Cemex, Inc. (McGibbon, James)
February 19, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anne Gorham on behalf of Cemex Materials, LLC, Cemex Southeast, LLC, Cemex, Inc. (Gorham, Patricia)
February 19, 2020 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Moving Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint) by Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Allen, Meredith)
February 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Tyner Helms re #51 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jed)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #23 Application of Tyner Helms for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #30 Application of Howard Feller for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #31 Application of Nicholas J. Giles for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #33 Application of J. Brent Justus for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #32 Application of Casey Erin Lucier for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
February 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Ashley Peterson re #46 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jed)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #34 Application of Ashley P. Peterson for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
February 13, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #34 APPLICATION for Admission of Ashley P. Peterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357215). Attorney Meredith Laughlin Allen added appearing on behalf of Argos North America Corp. and Argos Ready Mix, LLC (jkm)
February 13, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of J. Brent Justus Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357177).. Attorney Meredith Laughlin Allen added appearing on behalf of Argos North America Corp. and Argos Ready Mix, LLC (jkm)
February 13, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #32 APPLICATION for Admission of Casey Erin Lucier Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357147). Attorney Meredith Laughlin Allen added appearing on behalf of Argos North America Corp. and Argos Ready Mix, LLC (jkm)
February 13, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #31 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas J. Giles Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357128).. Attorney Meredith Laughlin Allen added appearing on behalf of Argos North America Corp. and Argos Ready Mix, LLC (jkm)
February 13, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #30 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard Feller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357112). Attorney Meredith Laughlin Allen added appearing on behalf of Argos North America Corp. and Argos Ready Mix LLC (jkm)
February 13, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyner D. Helms Pro Hac Vice. (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9320525) Attorney Benjamin Randall Keen added appearing on behalf of Premier Concrete LLC (jkm)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/19. (smj)
February 12, 2020 Filing 44 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Argos Ready Mix, LLC served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 43 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Argos North America Corp. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 42 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Holcim (US) Inc. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 41 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Thomas Concrete of South Carolina, Inc. served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 40 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Thomas Concrete of Georgia, Inc. served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 39 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Thomas Concrete, Inc. served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 38 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Giant Cement Company served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 37 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Cemex Southeast, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 36 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Cemex Materials, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 35 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Cemex, Inc. served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 34 APPLICATION for Admission of Ashley P. Peterson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357215).by Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC. (Allen, Meredith) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 10, 2020 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of J. Brent Justus Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357177).by Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC. (Allen, Meredith) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 10, 2020 Filing 32 APPLICATION for Admission of Casey Erin Lucier Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357147).by Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC. (Allen, Meredith) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 10, 2020 Filing 31 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas J. Giles Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357128).by Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC. (Allen, Meredith) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 10, 2020 Filing 30 APPLICATION for Admission of Howard Feller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9357112).by Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC. (Allen, Meredith) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 10, 2020 Filing 29 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Coastal Concrete Southeast II LLC served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Elite Concrete Holdings, LLC served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Elite Concrete, LLC served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Evans Concrete, L.L.C. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Evans Concrete Holdings Inc. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. Elite Concrete of SC, LLC served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Gould, C.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyner D. Helms Pro Hac Vice.by Premier Concrete LLC, Joy Woods, Keith Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Keen, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
February 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Laughlin Allen on behalf of Argos North America Corp., Argos Ready Mix, LLC (Allen, Meredith)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Application of C. Lance Gould for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/7/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
February 6, 2020 RETURN of #20 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyner D. Helms Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9320525). to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
February 6, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #19 APPLICATION for Admission of C. Lance Gould Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9320406).. Attorney C. Lance Gould added appearing on behalf of Premier Concrete LLC, Joy Woods, Keith Woods (pmb)
January 30, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyner D. Helms Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9320525).by Premier Concrete LLC, Joy Woods, Keith Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Keen, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 30, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of C. Lance Gould Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9320406).by Premier Concrete LLC, Joy Woods, Keith Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Keen, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premier Concrete LLC, Joy Woods, Keith Woods. (Keen, Benjamin) Modified to edit text on 1/31/2020 (ah).
January 22, 2020 Filing 17 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas Concrete, Inc.. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas Concrete of South Carolina, Inc.. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 Electronic Summons Issued as to Thomas Concrete of Georgia, Inc.. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to Holcim (US) Inc.. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Giant Cement Company. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Evans Concrete, L.L.C.. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Evans Concrete Holdings, LLC. (dmb) Modified on 1/27/2020 to correct docket text (dmb).
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Elite Concrete, LLC. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Elite Concrete of SC, LLC. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Elite Concrete Holdings, LLC. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Coastal Concrete Southeast II LLC. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cemex Southeast, LLC. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cemex Materials, LLC. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cemex, Inc.. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Argos Ready Mix, LLC. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Argos North America Corp.. (dmb)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Joy Woods, Premier Concrete LLC, Keith Woods. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9291046) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premier Concrete LLC et al v. Argos North America Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Concrete Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Concrete of South Carolina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Concrete Southeast II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cemex Southeast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Concrete of Georgia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Concrete of SC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argos North America Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cemex Materials, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans Concrete Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cemex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Cement Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holcim (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans Concrete, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Concrete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argos Ready Mix, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Concrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Concrete LLC
Represented By: C. Lance Gould
Represented By: Benjamin Randall Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Woods
Represented By: C. Lance Gould
Represented By: Benjamin Randall Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Woods
Represented By: C. Lance Gould
Represented By: Benjamin Randall Keen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?