United States of America v. $411,120.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $411,120.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Nikolay Vostrikov
Case Number: 1:2020cv00494
Filed: February 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint for Forfeiture, Nikolay Vostrikov Answer due 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 3/24/2020. (dob)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Forfeiture, by $411,120.00 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Extending Deadline to File Claim and Answer)(Habachy, Joseph)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Habachy on behalf of Nikolay Vostrikov. (Habachy, Joseph) Modified on 3/25/2020 to add applicable filer (dob).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (dob)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 03/06/2020. (Brown, Michael)
February 16, 2020 Filing 7 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2020 through April 13, 2020 and June 24, 2020 through July 12, 2020, by Michael John Brown. (Brown, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Dmitriy Rabayev (Brown, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Nikolay Vostrikov (Brown, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America Sent to Nikolay Vostrikov via Attorney Joseph Habachy (Brown, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed on 2/5/2020 for $411,120.00 In United States Currency. (tcc)
February 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $411,120.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $411,120.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Joseph S. Habachy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nikolay Vostrikov
Represented By: Joseph S. Habachy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?