Unity Realty Company, Inc. v. Minikon
Plaintiff: Unity Realty Company, Inc.
Defendant: Ophelia Minikon
Petitioner: Tracey Moore
Case Number: 1:2020cv00517
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ophelia Minikon, Unity Realty Company, Inc. re #6 Notice (Other). (bdb)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 20, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ophelia Minikon, Unity Realty Company, Inc. re #5 Order. (bdb)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bdb)
February 27, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Ophelia Minikon, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
February 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ophelia Minikon, Unity Realty Company, Inc. re NEF of Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Ophelia Minikon, #4 Order for Service. (bdb)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/7/2020. (bdb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the #2 Notice of Removal filed by Ophelia Minikon be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County. The undersigned also RECOMMENDS that Defendant be DIRECTED to seek leave of the Court before attempting to again remove the Gwinnett County Magistrate Court dispossessory action to this Court. This is a Final Report and Recommendation, there is nothing further pending in this action, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/7/2020. (bdb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Ophelia Minikon. (Attachments: #1 Additional Supporting Explanation - Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for the purpose of remand only. (PDF in R&R) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/7/2020. (bdb)
February 6, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop)
February 6, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Ophelia Minikon and Tracey Moore. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Modified on 2/6/2020 to add filer (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unity Realty Company, Inc. v. Minikon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unity Realty Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ophelia Minikon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracey Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?