Jordan v. Albertelli Law Calibur Home Inc. et al
Appellant: Elizabeth Jordan
Appellee: US Bank Trust NA and Albertelli Law Calibur Home Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00529
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Elizabeth Jordan re #8 Clerk's Judgment (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2020: # 1 Main Document- Corrected PDF) (tmf).
March 9, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
March 9, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Elizabeth Jordan re #8 Clerk's Judgment, #7 Order,. (tmf)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action. (tmf)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2020: #1 Main Document- Corrected PDF) (tmf).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: On February 10, 2020, the Court ordered Appellant to pay the required filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before February 28, 2020. Dkt. No. #4 . To date. Appellant has failed to do so. Accordingly, this matter is DISMISSED, without prejudice for failure to follow a lawful order of this Court. See LR 4i.3(A), NDGa. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/9/2020. (tmf)
March 9, 2020 Submission of #6 Bankruptcy Record Received, #4 Order,,, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - DESIGNATED ITEMS NOT FILED (Lugo, Yahaira)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing re #3 Bankruptcy Record Received. Record transmitted to the wrong case by USBC. (tmf)
February 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Elizabeth Jordan re #4 Order, and IFP form. (tmf)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant shall pay the required appeal filing fee of $298.00 or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before February 28, 2020. If Appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal maybe dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.3A(2) for failure to obey a lawful order of the Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the undersigned on February 28, 2020 and to mail an in forma pauperis application alongside a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2020. (tmf)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 ---TRANSMITTED TO WRONG CASE per #5 Notice of Filing ---BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc23 - Motion to stay appeal, #2 Doc26 - Order on Motion)(Lugo, Yahaira) Modified on 2/11/2020 to edit text (tmf).
February 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Elizabeth Jordan re #2 Order. (tmf)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2020. (tmf)
February 7, 2020 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for Fee determination, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (eop)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 20-60330-sms, filed by Elizabeth Jordan. Notice of Appeal filed 2/4/20 from Order entered 1/31/20 by Appellant Elizabeth Jordan. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 20 - NOA, #2 Doc. 17 -Order, #3 Docket Report)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Albertelli Law Calibur Home Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elizabeth Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Bank Trust NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Albertelli Law Calibur Home Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?