Regal Vista Equities, LLC v. Bates
Plaintiff: Regal Vista Equities, LLC
Defendant: V. Willadean Bates and Willadean Bates
Case Number: 1:2020cv00533
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Willadean Bates re #7 Notice (Other). (jed)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Willadean Bates re #6 Order. (jed)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jed)
February 28, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Mail sent to Willadean Bates re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation returned. Marked: Return to Sender; Insufficient Address; Unable to Forward. (jed)
February 11, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Willadean Bates re Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jed)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/10/2020. (jed)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/10/2020 within the #3 R&R. (jed)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal recommending that this action be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Dekalb County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/10/2020. (jed)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Willadean Bates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 2/11/2020 to edit file date (jed).
February 6, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by V. Willadean Bates. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regal Vista Equities, LLC v. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regal Vista Equities, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Leonard Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Willadean Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willadean Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?