Royal Food Service Co., Inc. v. Metrotainment Cafes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Royal Food Service Co., Inc.
Defendant: Atlanta's Best Patio, LLC, Downtown Dining, LLC, Eat at Joe's, LLC, Atlanta Sports Restaurant, LLC, Metrotainment Cafes, LLC, Virginia-Highland Restaurant, LLC, Mystical Pizza, LLC, Brookhaven Restaurant, LLC, North Pointe Sports, LLC, Total Hospitality, LLC, Northlake Roxx, LLC, Great Sports, LLC, Jeffrey Landau, Atlanta's Best Patio, LLC doing business as Einstein's, Mystical Pizza, LLC doing business as Metrotainment Bakery doing business as Sugar Shack, Atlanta Sports Restaurant, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille, Eat at Joe's, LLC doing business as Joe's on Juniper, Great Sports, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille, Downtown Dining, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille, Total Hospitality, LLC doing business as Guaco Joe's, Northlake Roxx, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille, Brookhaven Restaurant, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille, Virginia-Highland Restaurant, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille, North Pointe Sports, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille and Metrotainment Cafes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00544
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
February 25, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (rjs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 12, 2020 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing re: #9 *AMENDED*NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Motion Hearing previously set for 2/13/2020 at 02:30 PM is CANCELLED. Counsel has advised the Court the parties have reached a settlement in principle. (pdw)
February 11, 2020 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. North Pointe Sports, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 11, 2020 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Total Hospitality, LLC served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Atlanta's Best Patio, LLC served on 2/8/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Eat at Joe's, LLC served on 2/8/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Northlake Roxx, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Downtown Dining, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Mystical Pizza, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Jeffrey Landau served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Great Sports, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Virginia-Highland Restaurant, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Atlanta Sports Restaurant, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Brookhaven Restaurant, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 9, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc.. Metrotainment Cafes, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Maxim, Kevin)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 *AMENDED*NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining. Motion Hearing RESET for 2/13/2020 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. As no notice of appearance has been made by or on behalf of any Defendant, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to provide all Defendants with a copy of this notice.(pdw)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2020 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. As no notice of appearance has been made by or on behalf of any Defendant, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to provide all Defendants with a copy of this notice. (pdw)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(rjs)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Food Service Co., Inc. (rjs)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B) Attorney Certification by Royal Food Service Co., Inc. (rjs)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT Declaration (of Mark McClendon) in support of Motions for TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Royal Food Service Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Decl. Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Decl. Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Decl. Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Decl. Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Decl. Ex. 6)(rjs)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Royal Food Service Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(rjs)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Royal Food Service Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(rjs)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with TRO and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9342521) filed by Royal Food Service Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 6, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED, and #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Food Service Co., Inc. v. Metrotainment Cafes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta's Best Patio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown Dining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eat at Joe's, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Sports Restaurant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrotainment Cafes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia-Highland Restaurant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mystical Pizza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookhaven Restaurant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Pointe Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northlake Roxx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Sports, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta's Best Patio, LLC doing business as Einstein's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mystical Pizza, LLC doing business as Metrotainment Bakery doing business as Sugar Shack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Sports Restaurant, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eat at Joe's, LLC doing business as Joe's on Juniper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Sports, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downtown Dining, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Hospitality, LLC doing business as Guaco Joe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northlake Roxx, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookhaven Restaurant, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia-Highland Restaurant, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Pointe Sports, LLC doing business as Hudson Grille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrotainment Cafes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Food Service Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Allen Maxim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?