Allie v. Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan
Plaintiff: Mildred Allie
Defendant: Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00591
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01754. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF GEORGIA. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 2/4/2020. (RJE) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Stipulation. (Hittler, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Transfer Action to US District Court for Northern District of Georgia by Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. Jointly Signed by Mildred Allie. (Hittler, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/14/2019. (HAM) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 6/1/2020. Motions (disp) due by 8/1/2020. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/14/2019. (HAM) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/14/2019. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan.(McDonald, John) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason R. Carruthers for Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Timothy McDonald for Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/2/2019. (NAH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Timothy McDonald. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7180213 filed by Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. (Hittler, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason R. Carruthers. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7180199 filed by Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. (Hittler, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. (Hittler, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan is an employee welfare benefit plan (Plan) governed by the provisions of the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974, as amended, 29 U.S.C. 1001, et seq. Delta Air Lines, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, is the sponsor to the Plan. Delta Air Lines, Inc., does not have a parent corporation nor does any publicly-held corporation own 10% or more of its stock. (Hittler, William) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (MKB). [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. (Hittler, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. (Hittler, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. (Hittler, William) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Mildred Allie. Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Bauer, Blake) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
July 2, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1754 (WMW/TNL). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6974185) filed by Mildred Allie. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bauer, Blake) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allie v. Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Family-Care Disability and Survivorship Plan
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Represented By: William D. Hittler
Represented By: Jason Richard Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Allie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?