King Union Properties LLC v. Holden
Plaintiff: King Union Properties LLC
Defendant: Neshia Holden
Case Number: 1:2020cv00681
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Neshia Holden and Certified Copy to Magistrate Court of Cobb County re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #7 Letter. (bdb)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to Magistrate Court of Cobb County re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (bdb)
March 31, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (bdb)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation and case is remanded to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Upon remand, the Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/31/2020. (bdb)
March 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Neshia Holden re #5 Order. (ah)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ah)
March 11, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (jpa)
February 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Neshia Holden re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rlb)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 2/19/20. (rlb)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis for purposes of jurisdictional review only. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 2/19/20 within #3 R&R. (rlb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the #2 Notice of Removal be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. To the extent the notice of removal should be construed to contain a motion to stay eviction the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 2/19/20. (rlb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Neshia Holden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 14, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (eop)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Neshia Holden. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Union Properties LLC v. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Union Properties LLC
Represented By: James M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neshia Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?