IH3 Property Borrower LP/IH3 Property Georgia LP et al v. Carter
Plaintiff: Invitation Homes and IH3 Property Borrower LP/IH3 Property Georgia LP
Defendant: Jessica Carter
Case Number: 1:2020cv00819
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Clerk of Court re #7 Remand Letter and #6 Order. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jessica Carter, IH3 Property Borrower LP/IH3 Property Georgia LP, Invitation Homes re #6 Order. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Remand Letter to Clerk of Court. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Douglas County, Georgia, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Upon remand, the Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/1/2020. (rjs)
March 25, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (jpa)
March 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jessica Carter, IH3 Property Borrower LP/IH3 Property Georgia LP and Invitation Homes re #5 Order. (ah)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ah)
March 5, 2020 NEF regenerated for #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (PDF corrected) (aaq)
March 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jessica Carter, IH3 Property Borrower LP/IH3 Property Georgia LP and Invitation Homes re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ah)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/4/2020. (ah)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisfor purposes of jurisdictional review only. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/4/2020 within the #3 R&R. (ah)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal. Defendant has failed to demonstrate that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs claim and that removal is proper. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that the District Court REMAND this action to the Magistrate Court of Douglas County, Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #2 Corrected Main Document) (ah).
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Jessica Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 26, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (ah)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jessica Carter. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IH3 Property Borrower LP/IH3 Property Georgia LP et al v. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Invitation Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IH3 Property Borrower LP/IH3 Property Georgia LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?