Wesley Stonecrest et al v. Alexander
Plaintiff: Wesley Apartments LLC and Wesley Stonecrest
Defendant: Terri Alexander
Case Number: 1:2020cv00831
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Referring Judge: Russell G Vineyard
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Submission of #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jap)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Terri Alexander re #6 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #5 Final Report and Recommendation returned via USPS marked "Return to Sender". (ddm)
April 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Terri Alexander as to Terri Alexander regarding #7 Order. (mlb)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
April 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terri Alexander re #3 Notice (Other). (jap)
April 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terri Alexander re #6 Order and #5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jap)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Service of #5 Final Report and Recommendation. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 4/2/2020. (jap)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 4/2/2020 within the #5 R&R. (jap)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the #4 Notice of Removal. The Court RECOMMENDS that this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this reference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 4/2/2020. (jap)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Dissolution of Eviction (construed as a NOTICE OF REMOVAL) with COMPLAINT. filed by Terri Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terri Alexander re #2 Order. (jap)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jap)
February 26, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (eop)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Terri Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Dissolution of Eviction, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley Stonecrest et al v. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Apartments LLC
Represented By: James M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Stonecrest
Represented By: James M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?