Latimer v. Shellpoint Mortgage Service
Plaintiff: Jonathan Latimer
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv00841
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Latimer re #5 Order and #6 Clerk's Judgment. (rjs)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (rjs)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 20, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to timely comply with the magistrate judge's February 25, 2020 order to pay the $400 filing fee, due to the denial of his IFP application. Pursuant to Local Rule 41.3, this case is DISMISSED for failure or refusal to obey a lawful order of the Court. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/20/2020. (rjs)
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Latimer re #4 Notice (Other). (rjs)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Latimer re #3 Order. (rjs)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (rjs)
March 18, 2020 Submission of #2 Order to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
February 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jonathan Latimer re #2 Order. (rjs)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DENYING In Forma Pauperis and ORDERING him to PAY the $400 due in filing and administrative fees WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the entry date of this Order. Failure to comply with the terms of this Order may result in dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/25/2020. (rjs)
February 24, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (rjs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan Latimer. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latimer v. Shellpoint Mortgage Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?