IH3 Property Borrower LP et al v. Blalock
Plaintiff: IH3 Property Borrower LP, Invitation Homes and IH3 Property Georgia LP
Defendant: Marcus Blalock
Case Number: 1:2020cv00842
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: Regina D Cannon
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
April 1, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
April 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marcus Blalock re #7 Letter, #6 Order. (ddm)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County regarding the remand of this action to their court. (ddm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2020: #1 Acceptance of Filing by Fulton County) (ddm).
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving and adopting the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court and remanding this case to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/1/2020. (ddm)
March 31, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
March 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marcus Blalock re #5 Order. (ddm)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ddm)
March 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marcus Blalock re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jed)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/10/2020. (jed)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/10/2020 within the #3 R&R. (jed)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal recommending that the District Court REMAND this action to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Moreover, to the extent that the notice of removal should be construed to contain a motion to stay eviction, (see Doc. 1-1), the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/10/2020. (jed)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Marcus Blalock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 26, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jap)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Blalock. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal of Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IH3 Property Borrower LP et al v. Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IH3 Property Borrower LP
Represented By: Lynn Marie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Invitation Homes
Represented By: Lynn Marie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IH3 Property Georgia LP
Represented By: Lynn Marie Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Blalock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?