1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust et al v. Weissman et al
Plaintiff: Janet Maddox, James Maddox and 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust
Defendant: NewRez LLC, HSBC Bank USA N.A., Seth G. Weissman, Martgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS), OCWEN Financial/PHH Mortgage. Services. et al and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00885
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust, James Maddox, and Janet Maddox re #13 Notice (Other). (jap)
April 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust, James Maddox, and Janet Maddox re #14 Order. (jap)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' #7 request for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/2/2020. (jap)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 30, 2020 Submission of #11 MOTION to Stay, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (jpa)
March 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust, James Maddox, and Janet Maddox re #12 Order. (jap)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jap)
March 23, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (clk)
March 20, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #6 MOTION to Amend, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (jpa)
March 13, 2020 Submission of #2 Order, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (jpa)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay pending Bankruptcy Case 20-63874by James Maddox, Janet Maddox. (clk)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 Motion construed as a NOTICE of Change of Address for 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust (clk)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to 1929 M&M Family Ministries re #5 Order (jpa)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to 1929 M&M Family Ministries re #2 Order (jpa)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiffs Motion for Emergency Restraining Order by James Maddox, Janet Maddox. (rlb)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Complaint by James Maddox, Janet Maddox. (rlb)
February 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-885-ELR-JCF. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jpa)
February 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust, James Maddox, Janet Maddox re #5 Order. (jpa)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining Order as found in their #3 Complaint. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to Refer this case to a Magistrate Judge pursuant to Standing Order 18-01. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 2/28/20. (jpa)
February 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Janet & James Maddox and 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust as to 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust, James Maddox and Janet Maddox regarding #4 Order. (mlb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
February 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Janet Maddox re #2 Order. (jap)
February 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Maddox re #2 Order. (jap)
February 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust re #2 Order. (jap)
February 27, 2020 Submission of #3 Complaint and Request for Injunction to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jap)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION filed by Janet Maddox, James Maddox, 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust (entered pursuant to this Court's #2 Order). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Lis Pends) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' request to proceed In Forma Pauperis. If no Plaintiff pays the filing fee within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order, the undersigned will recommend to the district judge this action be dismissed. Plaintiff 1929 M&M Family Ministry Express Trust is also DIRECTED to obtain counsel as set forth above and file a notice of entry of that counsel no later than 14 days from the date of entry of this Order, or the undersigned will recommend to the District Judge its claims be dismissed. The Clerk is directed to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon expiration of the above-stated deadlines if Plaintiffs fail to comply with this Order. The Clerk is further directed to submit this action to the District Judge for review of Plaintiffs request for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 2/27/2020. (jap)
February 26, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (jpa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust, James Maddox, Janet Maddox. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Lis Pends)(jpa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust et al v. Weissman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth G. Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Financial/PHH Mortgage. Services. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1929 M&M Family Ministries Express Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?