Home SFR Borrower, LLC et al v. Redman et al
Plaintiff: HavenBrook Homes, LLC, Front Yard Residential and Home SFR Borrower, LLC
Defendant: Ashley Nicole Redman and Marcus Le Antoine Redman
Case Number: 1:2020cv00905
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Front Yard Residential, HavenBrook Homes, LLC, Home SFR Borrower, LLC, Ashley Nicole Redman, Marcus Le Antoine Redman re #7 Notice (Other). (jed)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 31, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
March 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Front Yard Residential, HavenBrook Homes, LLC, Home SFR Borrower, LLC, Ashley Nicole Redman, Marcus Le Antoine Redman re #5 Order. (jed)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jed)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION and Response to #3 Report and Recommendation, filed by Ashley Nicole Redman, Marcus Le Antoine Redman. (rvb)
March 12, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Front Yard Residential, HavenBrook Homes, LLC, Home SFR Borrower, LLC, Ashley Nicole Redman and Marcus Le Antoine Redman re Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jed)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 3/12/2020. (jed)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 3/12/2020 within the #3 R&R. (jed)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Henry County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 3/12/2020. (jed)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Ashley Nicole Redman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 28, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ah)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ashley Nicole Redman. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home SFR Borrower, LLC et al v. Redman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Nicole Redman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Le Antoine Redman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HavenBrook Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Front Yard Residential
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home SFR Borrower, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?