RRE The Reserve Associates LLC v. Velazco
Plaintiff: BRE The Reserve Associates LLC and RRE The Reserve Associates LLC
Defendant: Carlos Velazco
Case Number: 1:2020cv00949
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
April 1, 2020 Case has been electronically remanded. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to RRE The Reserve Associates LLC, Carlos Velazco re #6 Order. (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation. This action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Upon remand, the Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/1/2020. (rjs)
March 25, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (jpa)
March 24, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to RRE The Reserve Associates LLC and Carlos Velazco re #5 Order. (ah)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (ah)
March 4, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to RRE The Reserve Associates LLC and Carlos Velazco re Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jed)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/4/2020. (jed)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/4/2020 within the #3 R&R. (jed)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal recommending that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/4/2020. (jed)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Carlos Velazco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 3, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Carlos Velazco. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RRE The Reserve Associates LLC v. Velazco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Velazco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRE The Reserve Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RRE The Reserve Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?