Ledcomm LLC v. Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Ledcomm LLC
Defendant: Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. and Sengled USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00956
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Sengled USA, Inc. Answer due 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/16/2020. (jta)
April 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Ledcomm LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Ledcomm LLC. Sengled USA, Inc. served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Hill, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jta)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Boyea; GRANTING #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Grosby; GRANTING #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George Lee; GRANTING #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jae Y. Pak; GRANTING #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cole Richter; and GRANTING #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean M. Sullivan by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on March 11, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb)
March 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Sean M. Sullivan added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb)
March 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Cole Richter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454417).. Attorney Cole Richter added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb)
March 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jae Y. Pak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454405).. Attorney Jae Y. Pak added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb)
March 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of George Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454389).. Attorney George I. Lee added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb)
March 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of David R. Grosby Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454377).. Attorney David R. Grosby added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb)
March 11, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Boyea Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454363).. Attorney Michael Boyea added appearing on behalf of Ledcomm LLC (nmb)
March 11, 2020 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC.(lwb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean M. Sullivan Pro Hac Vice.by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 10, 2020 RETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9448202). to attorney for correction regarding courts. (nmb)
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Cole Richter Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454417).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jae Y. Pak Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454405).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of George Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454389).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of David R. Grosby Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454377).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Boyea Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9454363).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Sean Sullivan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9448202).by Ledcomm LLC. (Hill, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/3/2020. (jta)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. and Sengled USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Sengled USA)(ah)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ah)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ledcomm LLC. (ah)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ledcomm LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9434220). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledcomm LLC v. Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledcomm LLC
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Martha Logan Decker
Represented By: George I. Lee
Represented By: Jae Y. Pak
Represented By: David R. Grosby
Represented By: Michael Boyea
Represented By: Sean M. Sullivan
Represented By: Cole Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sengled USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?