Boyland et al v. Beauregard et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Boyland, Bank Bag Publishing and On The Strength Records
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc., Alien Records, Inc., Paul Beauregard, Sony Music Entertainment Digital, LLC, Capital Music Group, 1400 Entertainment, LLC, Sony Corporation of America, Inc., Tefnoise Publishing, LLC, Ten Thousand Projects, LLC, Caroline Distribution and Sony Music Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00972
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Sony Corporation of America, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment Digital, LLC, Sony Music Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Ryan) Modified on 5/1/2020 to add document link and modify text (jap).
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Lance Isenberg on behalf of Sony Corporation of America, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment Digital, LLC, Sony Music Holdings Inc. (Isenberg, Ryan)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by May 5, 2020. All other deadlines shall remain in place. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter this Order and forward copies to counsel. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/30/2020. (jap)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bank Bag Publishing, Reginald Boyland, On The Strength Records (Honore, Alcide)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bank Bag Publishing, Reginald Boyland, On The Strength Records. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Honore, Alcide)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jap)
March 9, 2020 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Bank Bag Publishing, Reginald Boyland and On The Strength Records. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (eop) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #1 Incorrect PDF -Main Document - AO 121 Form) (eop). Modified on 3/5/2020 (eop). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #2 Correct PDF -Main Document - AO 121 Form) (eop).
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to 1400 Entertainment, LLC, Alien Records, Inc., Paul Beauregard, Capital Music Group, Caroline Distribution, Sony Corporation of America, Inc., Sony Music Entertainment Digital, LLC, Sony Music Holdings Inc., Tefnoise Publishing, LLC, Ten Thousand Projects, LLC and UMG Recordings, Inc.. (eop)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Bank Bag Publishing, Reginald Boyland and On The Strength Records. (eop)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Bank Bag Publishing, Reginald Boyland and On The Strength Records. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9438836) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyland et al v. Beauregard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alien Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Beauregard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment Digital, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Lance Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Music Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1400 Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Lance Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tefnoise Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Thousand Projects, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Distribution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Lance Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Boyland
Represented By: Alcide Honore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank Bag Publishing
Represented By: Alcide Honore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: On The Strength Records
Represented By: Alcide Honore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?