Kastner-Gandy v. Henn et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Kastner-Gandy
Defendant: Mother Henn Productions, LLC and Amanda Henn
Case Number: 1:2020cv01059
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
September 23, 2020 Submission of #28 MOTION to submit this matter to a Court-annexed mediation session or other mediation session, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #28 MOTION to submit this matter to a Court-annexed mediation session or other mediation session filed by Amanda Henn, Mother Henn Productions, LLC. (Mihill, Thomas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to submit this matter to a Court-annexed mediation session or other mediation session by Samantha Kastner-Gandy. (Kaufman, Robert)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (adg) (ADI)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (ddm) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
June 8, 2020 Clerks Notation re #19 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by the Court.
June 5, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Mother Henn Productions, LLC. (Comer, Julie)
June 5, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Indiana, Evansville filed by Amanda Henn. (Comer, Julie)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Replies to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. The time for Defendants to file their respective replies to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended through and including June 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 06/02/2020. (rvb)
May 28, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons by Amanda Henn, Mother Henn Productions, LLC. (Comer, Julie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Replies re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Amanda Henn, Mother Henn Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Comer, Julie)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
May 18, 2020 Submission of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Indiana, Evansville and #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Indiana, Evansville and #11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Samantha Kastner-Gandy . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Kaufman, Robert) Modified on 5/18/2020 to relate #11 motion (bdb).
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Mihill on behalf of Amanda Henn, Mother Henn Productions, LLC (Mihill, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing Correct Brief in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Amanda Henn re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Indiana, Evansville (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Brief in Support)(Comer, Julie) Modified to remove duplication on 5/4/2020 (bdb).
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Indiana, Evansville with Brief In Support by Amanda Henn. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Brief in Support)(Comer, Julie) Modified to remove duplication on 5/4/2020 (bdb).
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Mother Henn Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Brief in Support)(Comer, Julie) Modified to remove duplication on 5/4/2020 (bdb).
April 21, 2020 Submission of #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to MOTION to Transfer Case, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Samantha Kastner-Gandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Kaufman, Robert)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Samantha Kastner-Gandy.(Kaufman, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Rachel Comer on behalf of Amanda Henn, Mother Henn Productions, LLC (Comer, Julie)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Transfer with Brief In Support by Amanda Henn, Mother Henn Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer)(Comer, Julie) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 4/6/2020 (bdb).
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Samantha Kastner-Gandy. Amanda Henn served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Treco, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bdb)
March 10, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint to District Judge Orinda D. Evans for review. (adg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mother Henn Productions, LLC. (adg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Amanda Henn. (adg)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Samantha Kastner-Gandy. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9454714) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kastner-Gandy v. Henn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mother Henn Productions, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Mihill
Represented By: Julie Rachel Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Henn
Represented By: Thomas J. Mihill
Represented By: Julie Rachel Comer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Kastner-Gandy
Represented By: Matthew Dempsey Treco
Represented By: Robert J. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?