Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC v. Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC
Plaintiff: Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01061
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Admission of Ricardo J. Bonilla Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-9661834).by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC. (Jarvis, Lawrence) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Lance E. Wyatt Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9661820).by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC. (Jarvis, Lawrence) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC. (Jarvis, Lawrence)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 1/29/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC.(Jarvis, Lawrence) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarvis, Lawrence)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neil J. McNabnay. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/1/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
April 30, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Neil J. McNabnay Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9633471).. Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added appearing on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC (cdg)
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Neil J. McNabnay Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9633471).by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by 30 days until May 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 4/2/2020. (jap)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarvis, Lawrence)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Rodell Jarvis on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC (Jarvis, Lawrence)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC. Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC served on 3/13/2020, answer due 4/3/2020. (Kent, Daniel)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cabrach John Connor and GRANTING #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Tatum Lee. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/25/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jap)
March 24, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Cabrach John Connor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9494179).. Attorney Cabrach J. Connor added appearing on behalf of Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC (nmb)
March 24, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Tatum Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9494288).. Attorney Jennifer Tatum Lee added appearing on behalf of Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC (nmb)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Tatum Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9494288).by Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC. (Kent, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Cabrach John Connor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9494179).by Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC. (Kent, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 12, 2020 Clerks Notation re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of the USPTO (adg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC. (adg)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC.(adg)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9454881) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Pat No 7,543,177, #2 Exhibit US Pat No 7,958,388, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC v. Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Rodell Jarvis
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile Networking Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Jennifer Tatum Lee
Represented By: Cabrach J. Connor
Represented By: Kevin Sean Kudlac
Represented By: Stephen Robert Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?