Eclipse Apartments LLC v. Borden
Plaintiff: Eclipse Apartments LLC
Defendant: Nicole Borden
Case Number: 1:2020cv01098
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nicole Borden re #10 Order. Second copy of Order #10 and docket sheet mailed at Defendant's request. Defendant indicated she did not receive copy mailed on 4/7/2020. (rvb)
April 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nicole Borden, Eclipse Apartments LLC re #10 Order. (bjh)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: after consideration of Defendant's objections and a de novo review of the record, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's objections #9 are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/7/20. (bjh)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation and Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by Nicole Borden. (jap) Modified on 4/7/2020 to add motion (rvb).
April 6, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III terminated from case. (bjh)
April 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of certified Mailing to Clerk Mag Ct Gwinnett Co GA re #8 Notice, #7 Order of Remand. (bjh)
April 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nicole Borden, Eclipse Apartments LLC re #8 Notice, #7 Order of Remand. (bjh)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to Clerk of Gwinnett Co GA re #7 Order of Remand. (bjh)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/6/20. (bjh)
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nicole Borden, Eclipse Apartments LLC re #6 Notice. (bjh)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nicole Borden, Eclipse Apartments LLC re #5 Order. (bjh)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (bjh)
March 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nicole Borden, Eclipse Apartments LLC re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bjh)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/17/20. (bjh)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/17/20. (bjh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Nicole Borden. The Court GRANTS Defendant Wright's application for leave to proceed IFP for the limited purpose of remand #1 . Because it is clear that this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over the removal action, it is further RECOMMENDED that the case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Gwinnett County. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/17/20. (bjh)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT from Magistrate Court, filed by Nicole Borden. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
March 16, 2020 Submission of the #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (aaq)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicole Borden. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eclipse Apartments LLC v. Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eclipse Apartments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?