Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC et al v. Phelps et al
Plaintiff: Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC and Jamba Juice LLC
Defendant: Phelps, Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC and G. James Phelps
Case Number: 1:2020cv01183
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #21 Order, (Stegawski, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on May 12, 2020. (ash)
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION to Set Aside Default by Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC, G. James Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stegawski, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 19 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Michael Andrew Stegawski added as attorney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(Stegawski, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC, G. James Phelps Certificate of Consent to Withdraw and Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (DeBorde, Frank)
April 27, 2020 Clerks Entry of Default as to Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC, and G. James Phelps. (jed)
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC, G. James Phelps.(DeBorde, Frank)
April 27, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED RESPONSE re #12 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendants Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) - filed by Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC, G. James Phelps. (DeBorde, Frank) Modified on 4/28/2020 to edit text (jed).
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #12 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Against Defendants Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) filed by Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC, G. James Phelps. (DeBorde, Frank)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank William DeBorde on behalf of Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC, G. James Phelps (DeBorde, Frank)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC, Jamba Juice LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Faris, James)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Jamba Juice LLC, Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC. All Defendants. (Faris, James)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Main Street Cafe I, LLC, Main Street Cafe, LLC, and G. James Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Main Street Cafe I, LLC, #2 Summons as to G. James Phelps)(jed)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC, Jamba Juice LLC (Phelps) (Faris, James)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC, Jamba Juice LLC (Main Street) (Faris, James)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC, Jamba Juice LLC (Main Street I) (Faris, James)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jed)
March 19, 2020 Submission of #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC, Jamba Juice LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit of Jaime Denney in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction)(Faris, James)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jed)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Faris, James)
March 16, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (jed)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jamba Juice LLC and Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9481649) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC et al v. Phelps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Cafe I, LLC
Represented By: Michael Andrew Stegawski
Represented By: Frank William DeBorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Cafe, LLC
Represented By: Michael Andrew Stegawski
Represented By: Frank William DeBorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. James Phelps
Represented By: Michael Andrew Stegawski
Represented By: Frank William DeBorde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamba Juice Franchiser SPV LLC
Represented By: Anne Peirce Caiola
Represented By: James White Faris, VI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamba Juice LLC
Represented By: Anne Peirce Caiola
Represented By: James White Faris, VI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?