Lechter et al v. Aprio, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Russell Dalba, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Andrew Lechter and Lawson F. Thompson
Defendant: Aprio, LLP, James Jowers, Robert Greenberger, Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Forever Forests LLC, Large & Gilbert, Inc., Jim R. Clower, Sr., Burr & Forman, LLP, Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP, Nancy Zak, Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C., Robert D. Keller, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc., Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC, Tennille & Associates, Inc., David C. Smith, Georgia Land Trust, Inc. and Habif, Arogeti & Wynne, LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01325
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 183 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Defendant Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Maple Landing LLC BDR, #3 Exhibit B - Oakhill Woods LLC BDR, #4 Exhibit C - Maple Landing LLC 8283 30 Dec 2010, #5 Exhibit D - Oakhill Woods LLC 8283 7 Dec 2010)(Maine, Dana)
October 16, 2020 Filing 182 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Tennille & Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Tennille & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Defendant Tennille & Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Bazzani, Roberto)
October 16, 2020 Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint with Brief In Support by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint)(Blair, Sam)
October 16, 2020 Filing 180 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by David C. Smith, Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Smalley, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 179 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM amended complaint with Brief In Support by Forever Forests LLC, Nancy Zak. (Attachments: #1 Brief brief in support of motion, #2 Exhibit maple landing ppm, #3 Exhibit Development map, #4 Exhibit empirical analysis)(Little, Samuel)
October 16, 2020 Filing 178 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Forever Forests LLC, Nancy Zak. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Little, Samuel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 177 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, First MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 9(b) FRCP with Brief In Support by James Jowers. (Leman, Joseph)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Georgia Alabama Land Trust Inc.'s request to file a brief of 35 pages in support of its Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/14/20. (rlb)
October 14, 2020 Filing 175 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on the Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buckley, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 174 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Exhibits by Sirote & Permutt, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 20101218 Maple Landing -- Complete Private Offering Summary REDACTED, #2 Exhibit 2 - 20101231 Maple Landing LLC-Amendment No 1 to Operating Agreement REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 3 - 12.21.10 Email from James Jowers to Russ Dalba REDACTED)(Thornton, Martin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 173 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint, or in the Alternative (), MOTION for Summary Judgment () with Brief In Support by Large & Gilbert, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nancy Zak)(Hitson, Brent) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
October 2, 2020 Filing 172 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Sirote & Permutt, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Peter Hardin, #3 Exhibit 1 - Maple Landing, LLC Confidential Private Offering Summary, #4 Exhibit 2 - Amendment No. 1 to Operating Agreement of Maple Landing, LLC, #5 Exhibit 3 - 12/21/10 Email from James Jowers to Russ Dalba, #6 Exhibit 4 - 8/21/19 Mossy Rock, LLC Notice re Settement, #7 Exhibit 5 - 1/17/17 Email from Jennifer Surrett to Member, #8 Exhibit 6 - 2/16/17 Email from Jennifer Surrett to Member, #9 Exhibit 7 - 8/14/17 Email from Jennifer Surrett to Member)(Thornton, Martin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 171 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of ACC and Dr. Keller's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Ex. A Dr. Keller's Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. B. Mr. Delaney's Declaration)(Delaney, Colin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 170 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Rains, John)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (aaq) (ADI)
September 16, 2020 Filing 168 Return of Service Executed by Lawson F. Thompson, Andrew Lechter, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Russell Dalba. Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Sloan, Jeven)
September 16, 2020 Filing 167 Return of Service Executed by Lawson F. Thompson, Andrew Lechter, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Russell Dalba. Jim R. Clower, Sr served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Sloan, Jeven)
September 11, 2020 Filing 166 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jim R. Clower, Sr. and Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC)(rlb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 165 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson for Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC (Sloan, Jeven)
September 10, 2020 Filing 164 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson for Jim R. Clower, Sr. (Sloan, Jeven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 163 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #3 Order (Becknell, Leslie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 162 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #3 Order (Bazzani, Roberto)
September 9, 2020 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #3 Order (Marschalk, Barbara)
September 9, 2020 Filing 160 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #3 Order (Cashbaugh, Travis)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Extension of Time. Aprio, LLP and Robert Greenberger, Sirote & Permutt, P.C., Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller and Large & Gilbert, Inc. shall move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before October 2, 2020 and each defendant shall be permitted to file a single brief of 45 pages. All remaining Defendants shall move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before October 16, 2020, subject to the usual page limitations or as previously ordered by the Court, but shall be permitted to adopt and incorporate by reference a part of a Defendant's brief that was filed on or before October 2, 2020; Plaintiffs shall respond to any motions to dismiss on or before November 20, 2020 and all Defendants shall serve reply briefs on or before December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/8/20. (rlb)
September 8, 2020 Submission of #158 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time , to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 158 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John) Modified on 9/8/2020 to edit event (rlb).
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: The Court GRANTS leave sua sponte for Plaintiffs to file the Amended Complaint. The Motions to Dismiss are DENIED as moot #81 , #131 , #133 , #134 , #135 , #137 , #138 , #141 , #144 , and #146 . The Consent Motion to Stay Rule 26 Requirements is likewise DENIED as moot at this time #154 . The Motion to Exceed Page Limits #130 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/3/2020. (ah)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
August 28, 2020 Filing 155 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Lawson F. Thompson, Andrew Lechter, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Russell Dalba.(Sloan, Jeven) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 28, 2020 Filing 154 Consent MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Requirements with Brief In Support by Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Consent Motion to Stay Rule 26 Requirements)(Cashbaugh, Travis)
August 25, 2020 Submission of #130 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
August 17, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Martin Cashbaugh on behalf of Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc. (Cashbaugh, Travis)
August 10, 2020 Filing 152 Certificate of Interested Persons by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.. (Hall, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Filing 151 Certificate of Interested Persons by David C. Smith, Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP. (Smalley, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 150 Certificate of Interested Persons by Forever Forests LLC, Nancy Zak. (Little, Samuel)
August 7, 2020 Filing 149 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Jason Bell (Bell, Jason)
August 7, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S. Bell on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller (Bell, Jason)
August 7, 2020 Filing 147 Certificate of Interested Persons by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller. (Delaney, Colin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Class Action Complaint with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A. Dr. Keller's Declaration, #3 Exhibit B. Mr. Delaney's Declaration)(Delaney, Colin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 145 Certificate of Interested Persons by Tennille & Associates, Inc.. (Rusnak, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Tennille & Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Tennille & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Defendant Tennille & Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Dimiss)(Rusnak, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 143 Certificate of Interested Persons by Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger. (Rains, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 142 Certificate of Interested Persons by Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc.. (Buckley, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 141 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Rains, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 140 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #3 Order (Buckley, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #3 Order (Maine, Dana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 138 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Maple Landing LLC BDR, #3 Exhibit B - Maple Landing LLC 30 Dec 2010, #4 Exhibit C - Oakhill Woods BDR 7 Dec, #5 Exhibit D - Oakhill Woods LLC 8283, #6 Exhibit E - Oakhill Woods LLC v Comm, #7 Exhibit F - Oakhill Woods LLC v. Comm)(Maine, Dana)
August 7, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Blair, Sam)
August 7, 2020 Filing 136 Certificate of Interested Persons by Sirote & Permutt, P.C.. (Thornton, Martin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 135 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Sirote & Permutt, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Peter J. Hardin, #3 Exhibit 1 - Maple Landing, LLC Confidential Private Offering Summary, #4 Exhibit 2 - Amendment No. 1 to Operating Agreement of Maple Landing, LLC, #5 Exhibit 3 - 12/21/10 Email from James Jowers to Russ Dalba, #6 Exhibit 4 - 1/17/17 Email from Jennifer Surrett to Member, #7 Exhibit 5 - 2/16/17 Email from Jennifer Surrett to Member, #8 Exhibit 6 - 8/14/17 Email from Jennifer Surrett to Member)(Thornton, Martin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 134 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 12(b)(6) 9(b) with Brief In Support by James Jowers. (Leman, Joseph)
August 7, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by David C. Smith, Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Smalley, Robert)
August 7, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Trent Leman on behalf of James Jowers (Leman, Joseph)
August 7, 2020 Filing 131 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Forever Forests LLC, Nancy Zak. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum Brief in suppoer, #2 Exhibit Maple Landing Documents, #3 Exhibit Development map, #4 Exhibit case analysis article)(Little, Samuel) Modified on 8/10/2020 to terminate duplicative Motion to Dismiss(bnp).
August 7, 2020 Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Forever Forests LLC, Nancy Zak. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Little, Samuel)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (jpa) (ADI)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #128 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/3/20. (hfm)
August 3, 2020 Submission of #128 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
July 31, 2020 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on the Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Tennille & Associates, Inc.. (Bazzani, Roberto)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. and Dr. Robert D. Keller's #123 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/29/2020. (bnp)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #122 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The Motion Defendants shall move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before August 7, 2020. Plaintiffs shall respond to any of the Motion Defendants' motions to dismiss on or before September 18, 2020. The Motion Defendants shall serve reply briefs on or before October 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/29/2020. (bnp)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting Georgia Alabama Land Trust Inc.'s #121 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/29/2020. (bnp)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting Baker Donelson's #118 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/29/2020. (bnp)
July 29, 2020 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Delaney, Colin)
July 29, 2020 Filing 122 MOTION for Extension of Time re: #60 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Delaney, Colin)
July 29, 2020 Submission of #118 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , #121 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on the Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
July 28, 2020 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on the Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buckley, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Bazzani on behalf of Tennille & Associates, Inc. (Bazzani, Roberto)
July 23, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Rusnak on behalf of Tennille & Associates, Inc. (Rusnak, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blair, Sam)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #116 and #117 Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/21/20. (hfm)
July 20, 2020 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Sirote & Permutt, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thornton, Martin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rains, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Smalley, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Edward Buckley on behalf of Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc. (Buckley, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Kristin Maine on behalf of Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc. (Maine, Dana)
July 15, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilson Edward Wray, Jr on behalf of Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson (Wray, Wilson)
July 14, 2020 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Steven Vickery (Vickery, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Greg Smith (Vickery, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for AJ Rollins (Vickery, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Colin Delaney (Vickery, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Wilson E. Wray, Jr. (Wray, Wilson)
July 14, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Paige Becknell on behalf of Tennille & Associates, Inc. (Becknell, Leslie)
July 14, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Marschalk on behalf of Tennille & Associates, Inc. (Marschalk, Barbara)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (ddm) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Harris Smalley, III on behalf of David C. Smith, Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP (Smalley, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 102 Electronic Summons Issued as to Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC. (bnp)
July 2, 2020 Filing 101 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson for Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC (Sloan, Jeven)
July 2, 2020 Filing 100 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jim R. Clower, Sr. (bnp)
July 2, 2020 Filing 99 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson for Jim R. Clower, Sr. (Sloan, Jeven)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
June 29, 2020 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hall, Steven)
June 29, 2020 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Peterson, Jennifer)
June 29, 2020 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Floyd, John)
June 29, 2020 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Rains, John)
June 29, 2020 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Balser, David)
June 25, 2020 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Strain, Ryan)
June 25, 2020 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Blair, Sam)
June 24, 2020 Filing 90 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Pritchard, Billie)
June 24, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Billie Barker Pritchard on behalf of Sirote & Permutt, P.C. (Pritchard, Billie)
June 24, 2020 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Pratt, James)
June 24, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Pratt on behalf of Sirote & Permutt, P.C. (Pratt, James)
June 24, 2020 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Thornton, Martin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Robert Thornton on behalf of Sirote & Permutt, P.C. (Thornton, Martin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lewis Balser on behalf of Sirote & Permutt, P.C. (Balser, David)
June 18, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Nathan Worthey by Large & Gilbert, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nathan Worthey)(Hitson, Brent)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #70 and #71 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/18/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
June 18, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #70 APPLICATION for Admission of Sam Berry Blair, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9804350).. Attorney Sam Berry Blair added appearing on behalf of Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C. (nmb)
June 18, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #71 APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Andrew Strain Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9804392).. Attorney Ryan Andrew Strain added appearing on behalf of Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C. (nmb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of Nathan Worthey by Large & Gilbert, Inc. (Hitson, Brent)
June 17, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Large & Gilbert, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support)(Hitson, Brent) . Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 6/18/2020 (bnp).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Large & Gilbert, Inc. may exceed the twenty-five (25) page limit set forth in Local Rule 7.l(D) in connection with its forthcoming motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Original Class Action Complaint by fifteen (15) pages, for a maximum length of forty (40) pages, excluding the case caption, signature blocks, and certificate of service. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/17/2020. (bnp)
June 17, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Tala Amirfazli on behalf of Large & Gilbert, Inc. (Amirfazli, Tala)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #72 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs 90-day class certification deadline shall be extended until 30 days after all Defendants have answered Plaintiffs Original Class Action Complaint. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/17/20. (hfm)
June 17, 2020 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Persons by Tennille & Associates, Inc.. (Tennille, Andre)
June 17, 2020 Submission of #72 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Class Certification Deadlines to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
June 17, 2020 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Tennille, Andre)
June 16, 2020 Filing 76 Certificate of Interested Persons by Large & Gilbert, Inc.. (Hitson, Brent)
June 16, 2020 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Amirfazli, Tala)
June 16, 2020 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hitson, Brent)
June 16, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by Large & Gilbert, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Hitson, Brent)
June 16, 2020 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Class Certification Deadlines by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Sloan, Jeven)
June 16, 2020 Filing 71 APPLICATION for Admission of Ryan Andrew Strain Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9804392).by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 16, 2020 Filing 70 APPLICATION for Admission of Sam Berry Blair, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9804350).by Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 16, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G. Hall on behalf of Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C. (Hall, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre Townsend Tennille, III on behalf of Tennille & Associates, Inc. (Tennille, Andre)
June 12, 2020 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Little, Samuel)
June 12, 2020 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Little, Samuel)
June 12, 2020 Filing 65 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Forever Forests LLC. Forever Forests LLC waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Little, Samuel) Modified on 6/15/2020 to correct waiver mailed date (bnp).
June 12, 2020 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy Zak. Nancy Zak waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Little, Samuel) Modified on 6/15/2020 to correct waiver mailed date(bnp).
June 12, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Fenn Little, Jr on behalf of Forever Forests LLC (Little, Samuel)
June 12, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Fenn Little, Jr on behalf of Nancy Zak (Little, Samuel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawson F. Thompson, Andrew Lechter, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Russell Dalba. James Jowers waiver mailed on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. (Sloan, Jeven)
June 4, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' answers or motions to dismiss due 7/31/2020. (jpa)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the schedule for plaintiffs and for all defendants who have been served or have waived service on or before 6/15/20 shall be as follows: Defendants shall move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 7/31/20; Plaintiffs shall respond to any motions to dismiss on or before 9/11/20; and Defendants shall serve reply briefs on or before 10/9/20. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/4/20. (jpa)
June 4, 2020 Filing 59 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time re: #1 Complaint, by Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rains, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawson F. Thompson, Andrew Lechter, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Russell Dalba. Tennille & Associates, Inc. waiver mailed on 5/12/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Sloan, Jeven)
June 2, 2020 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP. Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP waiver mailed on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Smalley, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David C. Smith. David C. Smith waiver mailed on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Smalley, Robert)
June 1, 2020 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawson F. Thompson, Andrew Lechter, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Russell Dalba. Aprio, LLP waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Sloan, Jeven)
June 1, 2020 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawson F. Thompson, Andrew Lechter, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Russell Dalba. Robert Greenberger waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Sloan, Jeven)
May 28, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Peterson on behalf of Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger (Peterson, Jennifer)
May 28, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by John Earl Floyd on behalf of Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger (Floyd, John)
May 28, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Rains, IV on behalf of Aprio, LLP, Robert Greenberger (Rains, John)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 18, 2020 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lawson F. Thompson, Andrew Lechter, Kathryn Dalba, Sylvia Thompson, Russell Dalba. Large & Gilbert, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Sloan, Jeven)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 27, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. answer due 6/13/2020; Robert D. Keller answer due 6/13/2020. (tmf)
April 24, 2020 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons by Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Robert D. Keller mailed 4/14/2020, Answers due 6/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Waivers of Service of Summons)(Delaney, Colin) Modified on 4/27/2020 to edit event and text (tmf).
April 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Burr & Forman, LLP pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (bnp)
April 16, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Claims Asserted Against Burr & Forman,LLP filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson (McKenzie, John)
April 14, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Keith Smith on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. and Robert D. Keller (Smith, Gregory) Modified on 4/15/2020 to add filer(bnp).
April 14, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph Rollins on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. and Robert D. Keller (Rollins, Anthony) Modified on 4/15/2020 to add filer (bnp).
April 14, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Anthony Vickery on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. and Robert D. Keller (Vickery, Steven) Modified on 4/15/2020 to add filer (bnp).
April 14, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Dang Delaney on behalf of Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. and Robert D. Keller (Delaney, Colin) Modified on 4/15/2020 to add filer(bnp).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/14/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
April 13, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #41 APPLICATION for Admission of Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Andrew Lechter (cdg)
April 9, 2020 Filing 41 APPLICATION for Admission of Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. Pro Hac Vice.by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 8, 2020 RETURN of #33 APPLICATION for Admission of Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9566393). to attorney for correction regarding courts. (nmb)
April 7, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for John W. McKenzie (McKenzie, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Donna Lee (Lee, Donna)
April 7, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Tyler M. Simpson (Simpson, Tyler)
April 7, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Jeven R. Sloan (Sloan, Jeven)
April 7, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for Jim L. Flegle (Flegle, Jim)
April 7, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for W. Ralph Canada, Jr. (Canada, William)
April 7, 2020 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Compliance for David R. Deary (Deary, David)
April 6, 2020 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of Wilson Edward Wray, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9566393).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 3, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by John William McKenzie, III on behalf of Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson (McKenzie, John)
April 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jim L. Flegle on behalf of Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson (Flegle, Jim)
April 3, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Lee on behalf of Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson (Lee, Donna)
April 3, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler McLean Simpson on behalf of Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson (Simpson, Tyler)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , and #9 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/3/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
April 3, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler Simpson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540140).. Attorney Tyler McLean Simpson added appearing on behalf of Andrew Lechter (nmb)
April 3, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Donna Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540099).. Attorney Donna Lee added appearing on behalf of Andrew Lechter (nmb)
April 3, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of John McKenzie Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540076).. Attorney John William McKenzie added appearing on behalf of Andrew Lechter (nmb)
April 3, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jim L. Flegle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540047).. Attorney Jim L. Flegle added appearing on behalf of Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson (nmb)
April 3, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of William Ralph Canada, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540017).. Attorney William Ralph Canada, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson (nmb)
April 3, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of David R. Deary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9539817).. Attorney David R. Deary added appearing on behalf of Andrew Lechter (nmb)
April 2, 2020 Filing 28 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Atlantic Coast Conservancy, #2 Summons Baker Donelson, #3 Summons Burr & Forman, #4 Summons Clower Kirsch & Assoc, #5 Summons David C. Smith, #6 Summons Forever Forests, #7 Summons Georgia Alabama Land Trust, #8 Summons James Jowers, #9 Summons Jim R. Clower, #10 Summons Large & Gilbert, #11 Summons Nancy Zak, #12 Summons Robert D. Keller, #13 Summons Robert Greenberger, #14 Summons Sirote & Permutt, #15 Summons Smith Lewis & Haley, #16 Summons Tennille & Assoc)(bnp)
April 2, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Georgia-Alabama Land Trust, Inc. f/k/a Georgia Land Trust, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Robert D. Keller (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 24 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Tennille & Associates, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Jim R. Clower, Sr. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Large & Gilbert, Inc. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to James Jowers (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Nancy Zak (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Forever Forests LLC (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to David C. Smith (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Burr & Forman, LLP (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Sirote & Permutt, P.C. (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Robert Greenberger (Sloan, Jeven)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson to Aprio, LLP f/k/a Habif, Arogeti & Wynne, LLP (Sloan, Jeven)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler Simpson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540140).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Donna Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540099).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of John McKenzie Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540076).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jim L. Flegle Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540047).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of William Ralph Canada, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9540017).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of David R. Deary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9539817).by Kathryn Dalba, Russell Dalba, Andrew Lechter, Lawson F. Thompson, Sylvia Thompson. (Rappaport, Edward) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/30/2020. (jed)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (jap)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Andrew Lechter, Sylvia Thompson, Lawson F. Thompson, Russell Dalba, and Kathryn Dalba. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9526647). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lechter et al v. Aprio, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aprio, LLP
Represented By: Jennifer Peterson
Represented By: John H. Rains, IV
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jowers
Represented By: Joseph Trent Leman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Greenberger
Represented By: Jennifer Peterson
Represented By: John H. Rains, IV
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Rollins
Represented By: Steven Anthony Vickery
Represented By: Gregory Keith Smith
Represented By: Colin Dang Delaney
Represented By: Jason S. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Forests LLC
Represented By: Samuel Fenn Little, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Large & Gilbert, Inc.
Represented By: Tala Amirfazli
Represented By: Brent David Hitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim R. Clower, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burr & Forman, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith, Lewis & Haley, LLP
Represented By: Robert Harris Smalley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Zak
Represented By: Samuel Fenn Little, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.
Represented By: Sam Berry Blair
Represented By: Steven G. Hall
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Keller
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Rollins
Represented By: Steven Anthony Vickery
Represented By: Gregory Keith Smith
Represented By: Colin Dang Delaney
Represented By: Jason S. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirote & Permutt, P.C.
Represented By: David Lewis Balser
Represented By: Billie Barker Pritchard
Represented By: Martin Robert Thornton
Represented By: James Andrew Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Alabama Land Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Edward Buckley
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clower Kirsch & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennille & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Andre Townsend Tennille, III
Represented By: Roberto Bazzani
Represented By: Leslie Paige Becknell
Represented By: Barbara Anne Marschalk
Represented By: David L. Rusnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Smith
Represented By: Robert Harris Smalley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Land Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Edward Buckley
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Habif, Arogeti & Wynne, LLP
Represented By: Jennifer Peterson
Represented By: John H. Rains, IV
Represented By: John Earl Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Dalba
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jim L. Flegle
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Dalba
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jim L. Flegle
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Thompson
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jim L. Flegle
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lechter
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jim L. Flegle
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawson F. Thompson
Represented By: Jeven R. Sloan
Represented By: Edward Jon Rappaport
Represented By: David R. Deary
Represented By: John William McKenzie, III
Represented By: Jim L. Flegle
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: William Ralph Canada, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler McLean Simpson
Represented By: Wilson Edward Wray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?