Velez v. Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Enrique Velez
Defendant: Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01415
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Oriental Weavers USA, Inc. for Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc. by Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc..(Grant, Scott)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant Oriental Weavers, USA, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/26/2020.(Grant, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Enrique Velez. Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/2/2020, answer due 4/23/2020. (Wilensky, Michael)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb)
April 1, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint for review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bdb)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc. (bdb)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Enrique Velez. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9540922) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez v. Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oriental Weavers U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Scott H. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Velez
Represented By: Michael Stephen Wilensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?