Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. v. Bollea et al
Plaintiff: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Matthew Christian Loyd, Terry Gene Bollea, Cox Radio Inc, Cox Enterprises Inc and michael calta
Case Number: 1:2020cv01419
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #30 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (rjs)
April 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-March 31st Order)(Culpepper, Sterling)
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Sterling Gardner Culpepper, III on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Culpepper, Sterling)
April 1, 2020 Filing 28 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-00221. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Defendants Cox Radio, Inc. and Cox Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/31/2020. (SMB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 26 COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO FILE WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, SEPARATELY USING THE CORRECT EVENT CODE. NOTICE of Appearance and Waiver of Service of Summons Appearance by Shane B. Vogt on behalf of Terry Gene Bollea (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vogt, Shane) Modified on 3/30/2020 (BSN). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Joshua L. Blosveren re #24 Reply to Response to Motion by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blosveren, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc.. (Blosveren, Joshua) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Defendants may file a 7-page reply no later than March 25, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/19/2020. (SMB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave to File Reply by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Blosveren, Joshua) Modified text on 3/19/2020 (BSN). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Johnson, Stephen) Modified text on 3/18/2020 (BSN). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of compliance re 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Filing Fee and Electronic Requirements by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Hearing, Gregory) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua L. Blosveren, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew N. Bourne)(Hearing, Gregory) Modified text on 2/27/2020 (BSN). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joshua Blosveren (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA060194.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua Blosveren to appear pro hac vice . (ARC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Andrew Bourne (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA060194.) Related document: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew Bourne to appear pro hac vice . (ARC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Steven Silverberg (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA0560194.) Related document: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Steven Silverberg to appear pro hac vice . (ARC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Steven Silverberg, Andrew Bourne, and Joshua Blosveren may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants, Cox Radio, Inc. and Cox Enterprises, Inc., with Attorney Gregory A. Hearing designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the electronic filing requirement and file a notice of compliance with said requirement.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 2/25/2020. (NCR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Steven Silverberg to appear pro hac vice by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hearing, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text and removed image to Exhibit on 2/26/2020 (BSN). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew Bourne to appear pro hac vice by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hearing, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text, removed exhibit on 2/26/2020 (BSN). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua Blosveren to appear pro hac vice by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hearing, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text and removed exhibit image on 2/26/2020 (BSN). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Hearing on behalf of Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Hearing, Gregory) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Terry Gene Bollea. (BSN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Michael Calta, Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc., Matthew Christian Loyd. (BSN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/31/2020. (KAC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Johnson, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Stephen Hunter Johnson of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-221-T-30SPF. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16408003) filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Stephen) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 4/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. v. Bollea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Christian Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Gene Bollea
Represented By: Shane B. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Radio Inc
Represented By: Joshua L Blosveren
Represented By: Steven Silverberg
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Joshua L Blosveren
Represented By: Steven Silverberg
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: michael calta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sterling Gardner Culpepper, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?