PureCircle USA Inc. et al v. Almendra Americas LLC et al
Plaintiff: PureCircle Sdn Bhd and PureCircle USA Inc.
Defendant: Almendra Americas LLC and Almendra (Thailand) Company Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv01462
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Defendant Almendra Americas LLC has an additional time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint, through and including July 23, 2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/30/2020. (ah)
April 30, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Almendra Americas LLC answer due 7/23/2020. (ah)
April 29, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Almendra Americas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Cynthia)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PureCircle USA Inc., PureCircle Sdn Bhd. Almendra (Thailand) Company Limited waiver mailed on 4/24/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (Mulloy, Richard)
April 16, 2020 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by PureCircle USA Inc., PureCircle Sdn Bhd. Almendra Americas LLC served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Mulloy, Richard)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Petitioner Stuart Eric Pollack's #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/15/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Petitioner Richard Mulloy's #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/15/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Petitioner Brent O'Hatch's #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/15/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ah)
April 15, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Stuart Eric Pollack Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9582415).. Attorney Stuart Eric Pollack added appearing on behalf of PureCircle Sdn Bhd, PureCircle USA Inc. (cdg)
April 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Brent O. Hatch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9582338).. Attorney Brent O. Hatch added appearing on behalf of PureCircle Sdn Bhd, PureCircle USA Inc. (cdg)
April 14, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard Mulloy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9582393).. Attorney Richard Thomas Mulloy added appearing on behalf of PureCircle Sdn Bhd, PureCircle USA Inc. (cdg)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Stuart Eric Pollack Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9582415).by PureCircle Sdn Bhd, PureCircle USA Inc.. (Park, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard Mulloy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9582393).by PureCircle Sdn Bhd, PureCircle USA Inc.. (Park, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Brent O. Hatch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9582338).by PureCircle Sdn Bhd, PureCircle USA Inc.. (Park, Steven) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Almendra Americas LLC and Almendra (Thailand) Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons Almendra (Thailand) Company Limited)(ah)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by PureCircle Sdn Bhd, PureCircle USA Inc. for Almendra (Thailand) Company Limited (Park, Steven)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by PureCircle Sdn Bhd, PureCircle USA Inc. for Almendra Americas LLC (Park, Steven)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/7/2020. (ah)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
April 7, 2020 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons, - OK per WMR (sll)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by PureCircle Sdn Bhd and PureCircle USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent: PureCircle Limited; and Other Affiliate: Olam International Limited for PureCircle Sdn Bhd and PureCircle USA Inc.. (eop)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by PureCircle USA Inc. and PureCircle Sdn Bhd. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9564985) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Incorrect Summons)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified filer's name on 4/7/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PureCircle USA Inc. et al v. Almendra Americas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almendra Americas LLC
Represented By: Cynthia Jeannette Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Almendra (Thailand) Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PureCircle Sdn Bhd
Represented By: Steven Lee Park
Represented By: Richard Thomas Mulloy
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Stuart Eric Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PureCircle USA Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lee Park
Represented By: Richard Thomas Mulloy
Represented By: Brent O. Hatch
Represented By: Stuart Eric Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?