Graper v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Graper, Jr.
Defendant: Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01612
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Robert Graper, Jr. (Landreau, Matthew)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Robert Graper, Jr. (Landreau, Matthew)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Robert Graper, Jr. Medical Data Systems, Inc. served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Landreau, Matthew)
June 4, 2020 Clerk's Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Robert Graper, Jr. (Landreau, Matthew)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
April 16, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #2 Electronic Summons Issued. Added correct name on Summons to defendant, Medical Data Systems, Inc.. (eop)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Medical Data Systems, Inc.. (eop) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (eop).
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert Graper, Jr.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9596351) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graper v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Data Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Graper, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J Landreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?