Rochester v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Julian E. Rochester and J-Rock
Respondent: B. Stirling, R. B. Harwell, S. C. Admin. Law Court, H. F. Floyd, Beth Drake, K. F. McDonald, John Roberts, H. D. McMaster, H. M. Wilson, S. C. Court of Appeals, S. C. Sup. Court and Warden Williams
Case Number: 1:2020cv01705
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Julian E. Rochester re #6 Notice (Other). (kt)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 18, 2020 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Julian E. Rochester, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (kt)
May 6, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Julian E. Rochester re #5 Amended General Order.(kt)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis for purpose of dismissal only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 4/27/20. (kt)
April 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Julian E. Rochester re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Julian E. Rochester, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (kt)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 4/27/20. (kt)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Julian E. Rochester. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the instant Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DENIED. Leave for Petitioner to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED for the purpose of dismissal only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 2/27/20. (kt)
April 23, 2020 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (eop)
April 23, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Julian E. Rochester re #2 Order and NEF. (eop)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Julian E. Rochester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochester v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julian E. Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J-Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. B. Harwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. C. Admin. Law Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H. F. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K. F. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H. D. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: H. M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. C. Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. C. Sup. Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?