Pop Vapor Co., LLC v. Angel Distributors Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pop Vapor Co., LLC
Defendant: Salim Allani, Salima Allani and Angel Distributors Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01938
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 37 Amended JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Pop Vapor Co., LLC. (Hyland, Amanda)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 26, 2020 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Pop Vapor Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Hyland, Amanda)
June 25, 2020 Filing 34 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Pop Vapor Co., LLC. (Hyland, Amanda)
June 3, 2020 Submission of #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Persons by Pop Vapor Co., LLC. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 27, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Salim Allani, Salima Allani, Angel Distributors Inc. Discovery ends on 10/26/2020.(Mihill, Thomas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER granting #29 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/20/2020. (rjs)
May 20, 2020 COURT'S NOTICE: Counsel having notified the Court that the parties have reached an agreement as to terms of a preliminary injunction and will be filing a motion seeking same, the Preliminary Injunction hearing previously scheduled for 5/20/2020 at 2:00 PM is CANCELLED. (pdw)
May 20, 2020 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Order to Approve and Enter Consent Preliminary Injunction by Pop Vapor Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hyland, Amanda)
May 19, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Salim Allani, Salima Allani, Angel Distributors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit POP Trademark Record, #2 Exhibit Trademark Assignment Record, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Salim Allani, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Salima Allani, #5 Exhibit Google Image Search, #6 Exhibit Google Image Search)(Mihill, Thomas)
May 18, 2020 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Steve C. Jones via Zoom. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting - https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1601985719 Meeting ID: 160 198 5719 Password: 194186 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1601985719#,,1#,194186# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1601985719#,,1#,194186# US (New York) Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) Meeting ID: 160 198 5719 Password: 194186 Find your local number: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/abfVi7u9Yg Join by SIP 1601985719@sip.zoomgov.com Join by H.323 161.199.138.10 (US West) 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 160 198 5719 Password: 194186 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
May 15, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Kincaid Trimble on behalf of Pop Vapor Co., LLC (Trimble, Seth)
May 15, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Rachel Comer on behalf of Salim Allani, Salima Allani, Angel Distributors Inc. (Comer, Julie)
May 14, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction , as to Salima Allani. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 14, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction , as to Salim Allani. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 14, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction , as to Angel Distributors Inc.. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 14, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Mihill on behalf of Angel Distributors Inc., Salim Allani and Salima Allani. (Mihill, Thomas) Modified on 5/15/2020 to correct filer information (rjs).
May 14, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #17 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Steve C. Jones via Zoom videoconference, before the Honorable Steve C. Jones. As no notice of appearance has been made by or on behalf of Defendants, counsel for Plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide each Defendant with copy of this notice by close of business on Friday, May 15, 2020 and file a certificate/affidavit of service to that effect on the Courts docket. The Courts staff will provide Zoom log-in information to all necessary parties prior to the hearing. (pdw)
May 13, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Memorandum of Law in Support; and May 13, 2020, letter from Amanda Hyland of Taylor English Duma LLP regarding preservation of evidence , as to Salima Allani. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 13, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Memorandum of Law in Support; and May 13, 2020, letter from Amanda Hyland of Taylor English Duma LLP regarding preservation of evidence , as to Salim Allani. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 13, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Memorandum of Law in Support; and May 13, 2020, letter from Amanda Hyland of Taylor English Duma LLP regarding preservation of evidence , as to Angel Distributors Inc.. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Pop Vapor Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief - Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law ISO - Hyland letter to ADI re preservation of evidence, #4 Affidavit - Declaration of Aleem Wadhwania ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit A to Wadhwania Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Wadhwania Declaration)(Hyland, Amanda)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Plaintiff's #11 emergency motion is DENIED to the extent that it is seeking guidance from this Court on the appropriate course of action to take regarding the alleged counterfeit delivery. Rather, any course of action Plaintiff seeks to take must be requested by motion - absent the Court's impermissible guidance - and supported by legal authority. Plaintiff must also properly serve a copy of said motion on Defendants. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/8/2020. (rjs)
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Emergency Motion Seeking Guidance Relating to Evidence , as to Salima Allani. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Emergency Motion Seeking Guidance Relating to Evidence , as to Angel Distributors Inc.. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Emergency Motion Seeking Guidance Relating to Evidence , as to Salim Allani. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction by Thursday, May 14, 2020 and to serve a copy of the motion on Defendants. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/7/2020. (rjs)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for guidance from the Court on the proper custodian of evidence by Pop Vapor Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Aleem Wadhwania, #2 Exhibit A to Wadhwania Declaration (shipping receipts))(Hyland, Amanda)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Salima Allani. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Salim Allani. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Angel Distributors Inc.. (Hyland, Amanda)
May 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office re #7 A.O. Form 120. (rjs)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (rjs)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED AO 120 . (Hyland, Amanda)
May 6, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Salima Allani. (eop)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Salim Allani. (eop)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Angel Distributors Inc.. (eop)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Pop Vapor Co., LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9665970) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Exhibit -B -Sample Invoice from ADI, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pop Vapor Co., LLC v. Angel Distributors Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salim Allani
Represented By: Julie Rachel Comer
Represented By: Thomas J. Mihill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salima Allani
Represented By: Julie Rachel Comer
Represented By: Thomas J. Mihill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Distributors Inc.
Represented By: Julie Rachel Comer
Represented By: Thomas J. Mihill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pop Vapor Co., LLC
Represented By: Amanda Hyland
Represented By: Seth Kincaid Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?