Sebela Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sebela Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Perrigo New York, Inc.
Defendant: Stayma Consulting Services, LLC, Rick Henson and KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01940
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have through and including July 23, 2020 in which to answer, respond, or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/1/2020. (tmf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Rick Henson, KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Stayma Consulting Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brazier, Robert) Modified on 7/1/2020 to edit relief(tmf).
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC's ("KMM"), Stayma Consulting Services, LLC's ("Stayma"), and Rick Henson's ("Henson") Second Consent Motion Extending Time for Defendants to Respond Complaint. For good cause shown, and by consent of the Parties, the Motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall have through and including July 2, 2020 in which to answer, respond, or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/11/2020. (tmf)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Rick Henson, KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Stayma Consulting Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brazier, Robert) Modified on 6/11/2020 to edit relief(tmf).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC's (KMM), Stayma Consulting Services, LLC's (Stayma), and Rick Henson's (Henson) Consent Motion Extending Time for Defendants to Respond Complaint. For good cause shown, and by consent of the Parties, the Motion is hereby GRANTED. KMM shall have through and including June 11, 2020 in which to answer, respond, or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs Complaint. Stayma shall have through and including June 12, 2020 in which to answer, respond, or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Henson shall have through and including June 15, 2020 in which to answer, respond, or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/28/2020. (tmf)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Rick Henson, KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Stayma Consulting Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brazier, Robert) Modified on 5/28/2020 to edit relief(tmf).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 18, 2020 Submission of the AO Form 120 - Notice to Parties to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (aaq)
May 7, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #6 NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 3.4. (Holladay, William) Modified on 5/7/2020 to edit event, no AO 120 was filed.(tmf). (tmf)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/7/2020. (tmf)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 3.4. (Holladay, William) Modified on 5/7/2020 to edit event, no AO 120 was filed.(tmf).
May 6, 2020 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rick Henson. (eop)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stayma Consulting Services, LLC. (eop)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (eop)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sebela Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Perrigo New York, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9667340) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebela Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebela Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: William Brian Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perrigo New York, Inc.
Represented By: William Brian Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stayma Consulting Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Henson
Represented By: Robert G. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMM Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. Brazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?