Alliant CPA Group, LLC v. Bank of America, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Alliant CPA Group, LLC
Defendant: Bank of America, Corp., Bank OZK, Centerstate Bank, N.A., Cadence Bank, N.A., Truist Bank, Wells Fargo and Company, Cadence Bancorporation, Synovus Bank, Truist Financial Corp., United Community Bank, Inc., Ameris Bank, Newton Federal Bank, Bank of America, N.A., United Community Bank (Georgia), Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Centerstate Bank Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02026
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 25, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Carl Cook on behalf of Cadence Bank, N.A. (Cook, Gregory)
June 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to L. Conrad Anderson, IV re #51 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jta)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #47 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to L. Conrad Anderson, IV. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/25/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
June 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Gregory Carl Cook re #50 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jta)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #46 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory Carl Cook. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/25/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
June 22, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #47 APPLICATION for Admission of L. Conrad Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9815409).. Attorney L. Conrad Anderson, IV added appearing on behalf of Cadence Bank, N.A. (cdg)
June 22, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #46 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory C. Cook Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9815176).. Attorney Gregory Carl Cook added appearing on behalf of Cadence Bank, N.A. (cdg)
June 19, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Petitioner William B. Gaudet re #48 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jta)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Bank OZK may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint thirty (30) days after the Judicial Panel for Multi-District Litigation has entered an Order ruling upon the Plaintiffs' Motion in MDL Proceeding No. 2950, wherein the Plaintiff seeks to transfer twelve (12) related cases, as well as any subsequently filed cases, to this District for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/18/2020. (jta)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Petitioner William B. Gaudet. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/18/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
June 18, 2020 Filing 47 APPLICATION for Admission of L. Conrad Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9815409).by Cadence Bank, N.A.. (Bishop, Tyler) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 18, 2020 Filing 46 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory C. Cook Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9815176).by Cadence Bank, N.A.. (Bishop, Tyler) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 18, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Preston Bishop on behalf of Cadence Bank, N.A. (Bishop, Tyler)
June 17, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #44 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant CADENCE BANCORPORATION pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (jta)
June 17, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Less Than All Parties (Cadence Bancorporation) Without Prejudice filed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC (McDonough, James)
June 17, 2020 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. Cadence Bancorporation waiver mailed on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; Cadence Bank, N.A. waiver mailed on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (McDonough, James)
June 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #42 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice UNITED COMMUNITY BANK, INC., as to pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (jta)
June 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant UNITED COMMUNITY BANK pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (jta)
June 16, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #37 APPLICATION for Admission of William B. Gaudet Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9795034).. Attorney William B. Gaudet added appearing on behalf of Bank OZK (nmb)
June 16, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Less Than All Parties (United Community Bank, Inc.) Without Prejudice filed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC (McDonough, James)
June 16, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Less Than All Parties Without Prejudice filed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC (McDonough, James)
June 16, 2020 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bank OZK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomson, John)
June 16, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Truist Financial Corporation pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (jta)
June 15, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Less Than All Parties Without Prejudice filed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC (McDonough, James)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendants Wells Fargo and Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF #1 ) is extended until 30 days after the Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation rules on Plaintiffs motion to transfer 12 related cases, as well as any subsequently filed cases, to this Court for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/15/2020. (jta)
June 12, 2020 Filing 37 APPLICATION for Admission of William B. Gaudet Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9795034).by Bank OZK. (Thomson, John) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 12, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by William Vance Custer, IV on behalf of Newton Federal Bank (Custer, William)
June 12, 2020 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. Truist Bank waiver mailed on 6/10/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (McDonough, James)
June 12, 2020 Filing 34 Return of Service Executed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (McDonough, James)
June 12, 2020 Filing 33 Return of Service Executed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. Wells Fargo and Company served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (McDonough, James)
June 12, 2020 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. Truist Financial Corp. served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (McDonough, James)
June 12, 2020 Filing 31 Return of Service Executed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. Bank of America, N.A. served on 5/28/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (McDonough, James)
June 11, 2020 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo and Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Lindsey)
June 11, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John Archer Thomson, Jr on behalf of Bank OZK (Thomson, John)
June 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Ron C. Bingham, II on behalf of Bank OZK (Bingham, Ron)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/8/2019. (bgt)
June 9, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. Newton Federal Bank waiver mailed on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (McDonough, James)
June 3, 2020 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 6/3/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Bank of America, Corp. Answer due 8/31/2020; Bank of America, N.A. Answer due 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/2/2020. (jta)
June 2, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, Corp., Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.; Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc for Bank of America, Corp.. (Stevenson, Richard)
June 2, 2020 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Bank of America, Corp., Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Richard)
June 1, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. Synovus Bank waiver mailed on 5/29/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (McDonough, James)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Leigh Martin May recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:20-cv-02026-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/1/2020. (tmf)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark John Geragos. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/1/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
May 29, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark John Geragos Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9729318).. Attorney Mark J. Geragos added appearing on behalf of Alliant CPA Group, LLC (cdg)
May 27, 2020 Filing 20 First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synovus Bank identifying Corporate Parent Synovus Financial Corp. for Synovus Bank. (Prather, Ramsey)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI)
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark John Geragos Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9729318).by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. (McDonough, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramsey B. Prather on behalf of Synovus Bank (Prather, Ramsey)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Antonio Mortez Haynes. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/20/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
May 20, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Antonio Mortez Haynes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9701787).. Attorney Antonio Mortez Haynes added appearing on behalf of Synovus Bank (nmb)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Oral Order granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Paul Jeremy Nathanson. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/20/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
May 20, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul Jeremy Nathanson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9701808).. Attorney Paul Jeremy Nathanson added appearing on behalf of Synovus Bank (nmb)
May 18, 2020 Clerks Approval re #14 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ameris Bank, Bank OZK, Cadence Bancorporation, Newton Federal Bank, Truist Bank, Truist Financial Corp., United Community Bank (Georgia), United Community Bank, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Wells Fargo and Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bank OZK, #2 Summons Cadence Bancorporation, #3 Summons Newton Federal Bank, #4 Summons Truist Financial, #5 Summons Truist Bank, #6 Summons United Community Bank (GA), #7 Summons United Community Bank, #8 Summons Wells Fargo and Company, #9 Summons Wells Fargo Bank)(bnp)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC Bank OZK a/k/a Bank of Ozark (Attachments: #1 Summons Ameris Bank, #2 Summons Cadence Bancorporation, #3 Summons Newton Federal Bank, #4 Summons Truist Bank, #5 Summons Truist Financial Corporation, #6 Summons United Community Banks, Inc., #7 Summons United Community Bank (Georgia), #8 Summons Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #9 Summons Wells Fargo and Company)(McDonough, James)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-9687157. (McDonough, James)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alliant CPA Group, LLC by Alliant CPA Group, LLC.(McDonough, James)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul Jeremy Nathanson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9701808).by Synovus Bank. (Butler, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Antonio Mortez Haynes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9701787).by Synovus Bank. (Butler, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Butler, Jr on behalf of Synovus Bank (Butler, James)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/13/2020. (tmf)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Synovus Bank. (eop)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Centerstate Bank Corporation. (eop)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Centerstate Bank, N.A.. (eop)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cadence Bank, N.A.. (eop)
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bank of America, Corp.. (eop)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A.. (eop)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alliant CPA Group, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9687235) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Incorrect Summon(s)-(10) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 5/13/2020 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliant CPA Group, LLC v. Bank of America, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, Corp.
Represented By: Richard Scott Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank OZK
Represented By: Ron C. Bingham, II
Represented By: William B. Gaudet
Represented By: John Archer Thomson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerstate Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadence Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory Carl Cook
Represented By: L. Conrad Anderson, IV
Represented By: Tyler Preston Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo and Company
Represented By: Lindsey B. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadence Bancorporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Ramsey B. Prather
Represented By: Paul Jeremy Nathanson
Represented By: James Edward Butler, Jr.
Represented By: Antonio Mortez Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Financial Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Community Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameris Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton Federal Bank
Represented By: William Vance Custer, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Richard Scott Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Community Bank (Georgia)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lindsey B. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerstate Bank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliant CPA Group, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: W. Lewis Garrison, Jr.
Represented By: Mark J. Geragos
Represented By: James F. McDonough, III
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hoesly
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Represented By: Michael E. Adler
Represented By: Nitoj P. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?