Thomas v. Discovery Enterprises LLC
Appellee: Unnamed Appellee(s) and Discovery Enterprises LLC
Appellant: Edward E. Thomas
Debtor: Edward Earl Thomas
Trustee: Mary Ida Townson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02158
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Appellant's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Appellant may nonetheless proceed with his bankruptcy appeal by paying the necessary filing fee. This case shall remain closed unless and until Appellant pays the required fee. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/7/2020. (ddm)
July 7, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Edward Earl Thomas re #9 Order. (ddm)
July 6, 2020 Submission of #8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward Earl Thomas. (ddm)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing bankruptcy appeal without prejudice. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
June 15, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Edward E. Thomas re #6 Order, #7 Clerk's Judgment. (ddm)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing this bankruptcy appeal without prejudice under Local Rule 41.3(A)(2). Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/12/2020. (ddm)
June 12, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
June 12, 2020 Submission of #3 Order directing appellant to pay the required appeal filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
May 28, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Edward E. Thomas re #4 Notice (Other). (adg)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION FOR CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE J. P. BOULEE. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/27/2020. (tcc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 27, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Edward E. Thomas re #5 Order. (tcc)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant shall pay the required appeal filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis before June 9, 2020. If Appellant fails to comply with this Order, this appeal may be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.3A(2) for failure to obey a lawful order of the Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the undersigned on June 10, 2020, and to mail an in forma pauperis application to Appellant alongside a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/26/2020. (tcc)
May 26, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Edward E. Thomas re #3 Order, Forms sent to party: Affidavit to Proceed IFP. (tcc)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/20. (eop)
May 22, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Edward E. Thomas re #2 Order and NEF. (eop)
May 22, 2020 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for Fee determination, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (eop)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 20-63443-BEM filed by Edward E. Thomas. Notice of Appeal filed 5/18/20 from Order entered 4/21/20 by Appellant Edward E. Thomas. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 26 -NOA, #2 Doc. 22 -Order, #3 USBC Docket Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Discovery Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unnamed Appellee(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Discovery Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edward E. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Edward Earl Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Mary Ida Townson
Represented By: Mary Ida Townson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?