Celestin v. Bennett et al
Plaintiff: Ruth N. Celestin and Ruth N. Celestin doing business as Celestial Plastic & Reconstructive Surgery, LLC
Defendant: Myla Bennett and Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02167
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND/OR MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT with Brief In Support by Myla Bennett, Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Pleading Filed in Opposition Proceeding))(Johnson, Mark) . AddedMOTION for More Definite Statement on 7/17/2020 (bnp).
July 14, 2020 Refund in the amount of $150.00 has been processed, effective 7/13/2020 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
July 13, 2020 Submission of #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (kt)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 6, 2020 Clerk's Notation re #16 Certificate of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons by Myla Bennett, Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C.. (Johnson, Mark)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark C. Johnson. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/25/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(kt)
June 24, 2020 Clerks Approval re #13 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
June 24, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark C. Johnson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9829520).. Attorney Mark C. Johnson added appearing on behalf of Myla Bennett, Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C. (cdg)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendant Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C. shall have through and including 7/16/2020 to file a responsive motion or pleading or counterclaim. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/23/2020. (kt)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number GANDC-9829466. (Chouhan, Toqeer)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension)(Chouhan, Toqeer)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark C. Johnson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9829520).by Myla Bennett, Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Local Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order on Admission)(Chouhan, Toqeer) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Toqeer Abbas Chouhan on behalf of Myla Bennett, Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C. (Chouhan, Toqeer)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Mark)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Ruth N. Celestin. Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C. served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Cooper, Jason)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruth N. Celestin. Myla Bennett waiver mailed on 6/5/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Cooper, Jason)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (dgs) (ADI)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 AO Form 120 forwarded to the Director of the USPTO. (adg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C.. (adg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Myla Bennett. (adg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ruth N. Celestin. (adg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ruth N. Celestin. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9716694) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celestin v. Bennett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth N. Celestin
Represented By: Carrie A. Hanlon
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Seigel
Represented By: Jason Harris Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey Brandon Sladkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth N. Celestin doing business as Celestial Plastic & Reconstructive Surgery, LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Hanlon
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Seigel
Represented By: Jason Harris Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey Brandon Sladkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myla Bennett
Represented By: Toqeer Abbas Chouhan
Represented By: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ederra Plastic Surgery P.C.
Represented By: Toqeer Abbas Chouhan
Represented By: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?