Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd. v. Ho Kang et al
Plaintiff: Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd.
Defendant: Byung Ho Kang, Luke Kang, Saera Yoo and Saera Yoo doing business as KBH Consulting
Case Number: 1:2020cv02284
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 Initial Disclosures by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd..(Rogers, Beth)
July 23, 2020 Submission of #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd.. (Rogers, Beth)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Byung Ho Kang, Saera Yoo. (Baig, Mirza) Modified on 7/21/2020 (rjs).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support filed by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd.. (Rogers, Beth)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Byung Ho Kang, Saera Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Baig, Mirza)
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Byung Ho Kang, Saera Yoo. Discovery ends on 11/23/2020.(Baig, Mirza) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Saera Yoo by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd.. (Rogers, Beth)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Luke Kang by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd.. (Rogers, Beth)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff's #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO"), Accounting, and Other Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/8/2020. (rjs)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Byung Ho Kang, Saera Yoo. (Baig, Mirza)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Video hearing held via Zoom on Plaintiff's #2 Motion for TRO. Jaechan Oh sworn as interpreter. Plaintiff's witness Choonwoo Lim sworn and testified. Plaintiff's exhibits 1-4 admitted (counsel for Plaintiff to file copies via ECF.) Oral argument heard. Motion taken under advisement by the Court, with ruling to follow by written order. #2 Motion for TRO TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mirza Khurram Baig on behalf of Byung Ho Kang, Saera Yoo (Baig, Mirza)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd. (Rogers, Beth)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING re: Plaintiff's #2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Accounting and Other Injunctive Relief. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Steve C. Jones. As no notice of appearance has been made by or on behalf of any Defendant, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to provide Defendants with a copy of this notice a minimum of one (1) day prior to the hearing. Connection Instructions: Join ZoomGov Meeting https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1613283031 Meeting ID: 161 328 3031 Password: 945165 One tap mobile +16692545252,,1613283031#,,1#,945165# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1613283031#,,1#,945165# US (New York) Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) Meeting ID: 161 328 3031 Password: 945165 Find your local number: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/u/adqhb7Ud2b Join by SIP 1613283031@sip.zoomgov.com Join by H.323 161.199.138.10 (US West) 161.199.136.10 (US East) Meeting ID: 161 328 3031 Password: 945165 You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (pdw)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER Temporary Restraining Order re: #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Rogers, Beth)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd. (Rogers, Beth)
May 28, 2020 Submission of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #1 Complaint to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (rjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Byung Ho Kang and Saera Yoo. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(rjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Accounting and Other Injunctive Relief with Brief In Support by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd. (rjs)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with TRO and INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9744845) filed by Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd. v. Ho Kang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byung Ho Kang
Represented By: Mirza Khurram Baig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Kang
Represented By: Mirza Khurram Baig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saera Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saera Yoo doing business as KBH Consulting
Represented By: Mirza Khurram Baig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dongshin Motech Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Beth E. Rogers
Represented By: James Franklin Failey Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?