UniPro Foodservice, Inc. v. Certified Angus Beef, LLC
Plaintiff: UniPro Foodservice, Inc.
Defendant: Certified Angus Beef, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02286
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
July 14, 2020 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (dmb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Certified Angus Beef, LLC Without Prejudice filed by UniPro Foodservice, Inc. (Cooper, Jason)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 1, 2020 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons: Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONSUNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATEDCORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (adg)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (adg)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Certified Angus Beef, LLC. (adg)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by UniPro Foodservice, Inc. (adg)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UniPro Foodservice, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9745133). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CAB Website, #2 Exhibit B - CAB Podcast, #3 Exhibit C - CAB Event Atlanta, #4 Exhibit D - Hewitt Demand, #5 Exhibit E - UniPro Demand Response, #6 Exhibit F - CAB Further Demand, #7 Exhibit G - CAB May 11 Demand, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UniPro Foodservice, Inc. v. Certified Angus Beef, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UniPro Foodservice, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie A. Hanlon
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Seigel
Represented By: Jason Harris Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey Brandon Sladkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Angus Beef, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?