McWhorter v. Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer McWhorter
Defendant: Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC, Arbor Management Services, LLC, The Arbor CP, LLC, John Doe No. 1, The Arbor Holding Company, LLC, The Arbor Barrington Company and Audrienne Stevens
Case Number: 1:2020cv02328
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Arbor CP, LLC, Other Affiliate The Arbor Barrington Company, LLC, Other Affiliate The Arbor Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Arbor Management Services, LLC for Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC. (Reese, Howard)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/3/2020. (ah)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (adg)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Arbor Holding Company, LLC. (Filed in State Court 5/29/2020)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Arbor Barrington Company. (Filed in State Court 5/29/2020)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Audrienne Stevens. (Filed in State Court 5/29/2020)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC. (Filed in State Court 5/29/2020)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Arbor Management Services, LLC. (Filed in State Court 5/29/2020)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Arbor CP, LLC. (Filed in State Court 5/29/2020) Discovery ends on 10/26/2020.(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Arbor Management Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9749726) (Attachments: #1 Summons Arbor Management Services, #2 Summons Arbor Barrington Company, #3 Summons Arbor CP, LLC, #4 Summons Arbor Holding Company, #5 Summons Arbor Terrace at Cascade, #6 Summons Audrienne Stevens, #7 Complaint, #8 Answer for Arbor CP, LLC, #9 Answer for Arbor Management Services, #10 Answer for Arbor Terrace at Cascade, #11 Answer for Audrienne Stevens, #12 Answer for Arbor Barrington Company, #13 Answer for Arbor Holding Company, #14 Notice of Filing Removal, #15 State Court Civil Docket, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWhorter v. Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer McWhorter
Represented By: William J.S. Atkins
Represented By: Keith Lionel Lindsay
Represented By: Roderick E. Edmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbor CP, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbor Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbor Barrington Company
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrienne Stevens
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?