Amazon.com, Inc. v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Defendant: Phatlogic, LLC and Kenneth L. Jones, III
Case Number: 1:2020cv02338
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Kenneth L. Jones, III and Phatlogic, LLC Answers due 8/27/2020. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/30/20. (hfm)
July 30, 2020 Submission of #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp)
July 29, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kenneth L. Jones, III, Phatlogic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasgow, Julia)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until July 30, 2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/2/2020. (bnp)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Kenneth L. Jones, III, Phatlogic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasgow, Julia)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Filing Affidavit of Service of Phatlogic, LLC by Amazon.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Tanner, Caroline)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #8 , #9 , and #10 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/15/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing Affidavits of Service of Both Defendants by Amazon.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service of Kenneth L. Jones III)(Tanner, Caroline)
June 12, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Meagan A. Himes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9786745).. Attorney Meagan A. Himes added appearing on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (cdg)
June 12, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara A. Fairchild Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9786720).. Attorney Sara A. Fairchild added appearing on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (cdg)
June 12, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Bonnie E. MacNaughton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9786667).. Attorney Bonnie E. MacNaughton added appearing on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (cdg)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 13-15 2020, August 3-7 2020, by Caroline Johnson Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tanner, Caroline)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Meagan A. Himes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9786745).by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Tanner, Caroline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara A. Fairchild Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9786720).by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Tanner, Caroline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Bonnie E. MacNaughton Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9786667).by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Tanner, Caroline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Compliance by Amazon.com, Inc. (Tanner, Caroline) Modified on 6/10/2020 to edit event text (bnp).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/9/2020. (bnp)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Third Amendment to General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (jpk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Inc. by Amazon.com, Inc..(Tanner, Caroline)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpk)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth L. Jones, III and Phatlogic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Phatlogic, LLC) (jpk)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9752693). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Report on Trademark Filings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jpk) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com, Inc. v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phatlogic, LLC
Represented By: Julia Christine Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth L. Jones, III
Represented By: Julia Christine Glasgow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Johnson Tanner
Represented By: Bonnie E. MacNaughton
Represented By: Sara A. Fairchild
Represented By: Meagan A. Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?