Vaughn v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robbin Vaughn
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02342
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Stout, Nicole)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Delta Airlines, Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/21/2020.(Stout, Nicole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Delta Airlines, Inc. Answer due 7/24/2020. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/9/2020. (bnp)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stout, Nicole)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Robbin Vaughn. Delta Airlines, Inc. served on 6/4/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Funt, Samantha)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Delta Airlines, Inc. Answer due 7/10/2020. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/24/2020. (bdb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stout, Nicole)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/3/2020. (tmf)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Delta Airlines,Inc.. (eop)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robbin Vaughn. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9753702) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbin Vaughn
Represented By: Samantha Jill Funt
Represented By: Richard C. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Wolfe Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?