Fields et al v. Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Teri Fields and Catolyn Merriweather
Defendant: Audrienne Stevens, Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC, Arbor Management Services, LLC, The Arbor CP, LLC, John Doe No. 1, The Arbor Holding Company, LLC and The Arbor Barrington Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02346
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to complete her Motion to Remand and the parties to complete the JointPreliminary Report and Initial Disclosures is extended to 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 7/3/2020. (dmb)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Joint Preliminary Report and Initial Disclosures by Arbor Management Services, LLC, Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC, Audrienne Stevens, The Arbor Barrington Company, LLC, The Arbor CP, LLC, The Arbor Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Cone, Brittany)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 6/10/2020. (dmb)
June 10, 2020 Clerks Notation re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Arbor Management Services, LLC, Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC, Audrienne Stevens, The Arbor Barrington Company, LLC, The Arbor CP, LLC. (Reese, Howard)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Arbor Holding Company, LLC. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Arbor Barrington Company, LLC. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Audrienne Stevens. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Arbor Management Services, LLC. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Arbor CP, LLC. Discovery ends on 10/29/2020. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Arbor Management Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9753963) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons -Arbor Management, #3 Summons -Arbor Terrace at Cascade, #4 Summons - Audrienne Stevens, #5 Summons -Arbor Barrington, #6 Summons -Arbor CP, #7 Summons -Arbor Holding Co., #8 Answer -Arbor CP, #9 Answer -Arbor Management Services, #10 Answer -Arbor Terrace at Cascade, #11 Answer -Audrienne Stevens, #12 Answer -Arbor Barrington, #13 Answer -Arbor Holding Co., #14 Snead -Notice of Filing, #15 State Court Civil Docket, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields et al v. Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrienne Stevens
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Terrace At Cascade, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbor CP, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbor Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Arbor Barrington Company, LLC
Represented By: Howard W. Reese, III
Represented By: Brittany H. Cone
Represented By: T. Andrew Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Fields
Represented By: Mawuli Melvyn Malcolm Davis
Represented By: Harold W. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catolyn Merriweather
Represented By: Mawuli Melvyn Malcolm Davis
Represented By: Harold W. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?