Hunt v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Hunt
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies and Christian Sewing
Case Number: 1:2020cv02359
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Christopher M. Hunt. (aaq)
July 24, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE re #27 Notice of Filing Response to Motion to Join the Albertelli Firm, PC filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Anulewicz, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE Of Filing of Evidence of Deutsche with Epstein on Banking Violations by Christopher M. Hunt (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bnp)
July 14, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher M. Hunt RE: #29 Fifth Admin Order. (aaq)
July 13, 2020 Submission of #15 MOTION for Order to Show Cause, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (kt)
July 13, 2020 Submission of #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Substitute Party, #9 MOTION to Deny Dismissal with Further Proof Exhibits Remand Required Due Defendants no Standing Due 11th Circuit Ruled First Breach, #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (kt)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 10, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE Of Filing Consolidated Response in Objection to Defendants #21 Reply to Response to Motion, #22 Certificate of Service, and #23 Response to Motion by Christopher M. Hunt (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (jpk)
July 10, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE Of Filing Joinder Party Albertelli Served and Answers to Interrogatories Proves Case by Christopher M. Hunt (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (jpk)
July 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher M. Hunt re #26 Notice (Other). (kt)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 30, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held In Contempt of TRO, DCNG and 11th Circuit With Compelled To Answer Interrogatories Per Rule 21.5 (B) filed by Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Anulewicz, Christopher)
June 29, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Christopher M. Hunt. (ah)
June 29, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christopher M. Hunt. (ah)
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #21 Reply to Response to Motion, AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC.(Anulewicz, Christopher)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Deny Dismissal with Further Proof Exhibits Remand Required Due Defendants no Standing Due 11th Circuit Ruled First Breach, #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anulewicz, Christopher)
June 29, 2020 Submission of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to stay the deadlines for the Rule 26(f) Conference, the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and Initial Disclosures, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (kt)
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 USCA Acknowledgment of #16 Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher M. Hunt. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-12310-J. (pjm)
June 26, 2020 Submission of #4 MOTION for Reconsideration, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (kt)
June 24, 2020 Filing 19 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #16 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
June 24, 2020 Submission of #17 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis, to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (pjm)
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #16 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing Certified Copies of Exhibits by Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certified Copy of Final Order), #2 Exhibit B (Certified Copy of Complaint))(Anulewicz, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Christopher M. Hunt. (pjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2020: #1 Envelope) (pjm).
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Christopher M. Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pjm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 PRO SE EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause why defendant should not be held in contempt of TRO, DCNG and 11th Circuit with compelled to answer interrogatories per Rule 21.5(b) by Christopher M. Hunt. (tcc)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Anulewicz, Christopher)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Division of Corporations Search Result))(Anulewicz, Christopher)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Deny Dismissal with Further Proof Exhibits Remand Required Due Defendants no Standing Due 11th Circuit Ruled First Breach by Christopher M. Hunt. (jpa)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Due First Breach No Standing and All Matters are State by Christopher M. Hunt. (jpa)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Due First Breach No Standing and All Matters are State by Christopher M. Hunt. (jpa)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Deny Dismissal with Further Proof Remand Required due Defendants No Standing So Void AB Initio Illegal Foreclosure, MOTION to Amend Party typo with Joinder Party Albertelli by Christopher M. Hunt. (jpa)
June 10, 2020 Notification of Docket Correction re #7 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Re-docketed to assign Magistrate Judge. (kt)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (Contained in #7 Order Directing Referral). Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/10/2020. (kt)
June 10, 2020 Docketed in Error Submission of #7 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (kt) Modified on 6/10/2020 (kt).
June 10, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher M. Hunt re #7 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (kt)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to REFER this CASE to a Magistrate Judge to hear and determine any pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/10/2020. (kt)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to stay the deadlines for the Rule 26(f) Conference, the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, and Initial Disclosures with Brief In Support by Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anulewicz, Christopher)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Jay Bray, Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A (Amended Order Dismissing Case), #3 Exhibit B (Complaint))(Anulewicz, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Reconsider Order Conflicts U.S. Supreme Court, 11th Circuit, DCMG & State Law by Christopher M. Hunt. (rjs)
June 3, 2020 Clerk's Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
June 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher M. Hunt re #3 Order. (jed)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction contained within the #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 6/3/2020. (jed)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc. for Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies; Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (tcc)
June 2, 2020 Submission of #1 Notice of Removal (contains Emergency Motion for TRO or Preliminary Injunction), to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr.. (tcc)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BGANDC-9758054) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (EMERGENCY MOTION FOR TRO OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed at state court and contained w/in #1 Notice of Removal)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. Anulewicz
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Represented By: Brooke Walker Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Bray
Represented By: Christopher S. Anulewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Companies
Represented By: Christopher S. Anulewicz
Represented By: Patrick Nicholas Silloway
Represented By: Brooke Walker Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Sewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?