Eighteen Capital Group v. Cotton et al
Plaintiff: Eighteen Capital Group and Eighteen Capital Group doing business as Concord Chase Apartments
Defendant: Ronnie Cotton and All Other Occupants
Case Number: 1:2020cv02396
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 19 USCA Acknowledgment of #15 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Ronnie Cotton. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 20-12357-H. (pjm)
July 7, 2020 Filing 18 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Amended Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #15 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #15 Amended Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Filing of Motion IFP by Ronnie Cotton re: #8 Notice of Appeal and Amended Notice of Appeal as this document is being forwarded the USCA for determination as this court has already ruled and DENIED IFP per #13 Order. (pjm)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, by Ronnie Cotton. (pjm)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 USCA Acknowledgment of #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronnie Cotton. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-12357-H. (kac)
June 29, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to All Other Occupants, Ronnie Cotton re #13 Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis,. (jta)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. Further requests to proceed in forma pauperis should be directed by motion to the circuit court within 30 days pursuant to Fed.R.App.P.24. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/29/2020. (jta)
June 26, 2020 Submission of #12 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis, re: #8 Notice of Appeal to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (pjm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Ronnie Cotton. (pjm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO the #4 Report and Recommendation filed by Ronnie Cotton. (aaq)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order, Report and Recommendation and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #8 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: #8 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, by Ronnie Cotton. (pjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2020: #1 Duplicate NOA) (pjm).
June 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronnie Cotton All Other Occupants, re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jta)
June 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eighteen Capital Group re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jta)
June 18, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Magistrate Court of Cobb County, GA re #7 Notice, certified copy of #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jta)
June 18, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (jta)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Remand to Magistrate Court of Cobb County, GA re #6 Order. (jta)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Having reviewed this case de novo, the Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation #4 , CONCLUDES that it lacks jurisdiction, and REMANDS this matter to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/18/2020. (jta)
June 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronnie Cotton, All Other Occupants, re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jta)
June 17, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eighteen Capital Group re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (jta)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 6/17/2020. (jta)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (as found w/i #4 R&R). By Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 6/17/2020. (jta)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and ORDER RECOMMENDING re #3 Notice of Removal, be remanded to the Cobb County Magistrate Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). I GRANT Cotton's motion for permission to proceed in forma pauperis Doc. #1 because he has adequately alleged that he cannot pay the $400 due in filing and administrative fees for his notice of removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 6/17/2020. (jta)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Ronnie Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 5, 2020 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
June 5, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ronnie Cotton re #2 Order. (eop)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/20. (eop)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Ronnie Cotton. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal -1, #2 Notice of Removal -2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eighteen Capital Group v. Cotton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Other Occupants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighteen Capital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eighteen Capital Group doing business as Concord Chase Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?