Bacon v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl Annette Bacon
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02417
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI)
July 8, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Scott Fredrickson on behalf of Cheryl Annette Bacon (Fredrickson, Eric)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #55 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin O. Present. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/23/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
June 22, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #55 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Present Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Benjamin O. Present added appearing on behalf of Cheryl Annette Bacon (cdg)
June 18, 2020 Filing 55 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin Present Pro Hac Vice.by Cheryl Annette Bacon. (Harman, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 18, 2020 RETURN of #54 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin O. Present Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9800003). to attorney for correction regarding local counsel. (nmb)
June 15, 2020 Filing 54 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin O. Present Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9800003).by Cheryl Annette Bacon. (Present, Benjamin) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
June 11, 2020 Filing 53 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. S. Eric Rumanek replacing attorney Susan M. Robinson; David B. Thomas; William M. Gage and Christy D. Jones. (Rumanek, S.)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying #51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Should Attorneys Gage, Jones, Robinson, and Thomas continue to intend to withdraw, they may re-file the motion in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 6/10/2020. (jpk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.) Modified on 6/9/2020 to edit text (jpk).
June 8, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Norden on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Norden, David)
June 8, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Halli Dee Cohn on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Cohn, Halli)
June 8, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Eric Rumanek on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Rumanek, S.)
June 8, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorneys Christine Clarke, Christy Jones and David Thomas as to Cheryl Annette Bacon, Ethicon Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson regarding #47 Order. (mlb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 46 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-01143. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 1, 2020 Filing 45 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #37 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8529) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8623) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 44 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #37 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8557) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8644) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 43 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #37 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2017) Pls Mot to Exclude Barry Schlafstein, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2019) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Barry Schlafstein, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2174) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Barry Schlafstein, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8507) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Barry Schlafstein, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8611) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Barry Schlafstein)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 42 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #37 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2049) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #27 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #28 Exhibit MDL ECF (8541) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #29 Exhibit MDL ECF (8599) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 41 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #37 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8531) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8596) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 40 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #37 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2029) - Defs Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2031) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2169) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2212) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2832) - Defs Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2833) Defs Mem in Support of Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2904) Pls Resp to Defs Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8556) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot and Replies in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8590) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Michael Thomas Margolis)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 39 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #37 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8519) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8588) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 38 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #37 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 37 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/05/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 06/04/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #12 MOTION by Cheryl Annette Bacon to Substitute Lee Balefsky and Christine Clarke as Counsel in lieu of Howard L. Nations. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/19/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #30 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Cheryl Annette Bacon in support of #32 Response In Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Cheryl Annette Bacon in opposition to #29 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude or Limit the Case Specific Opinions of Kevin Jovanovic, M.D. on Daubert Grounds (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Cheryl Annette Bacon in opposition to #27 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Cheryl Annette Bacon in opposition to #27 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude or Limit the Case Specific Opinions of Kevin Jovanovic, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #27 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Errata 4)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Placeholder on TBD at TBD (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kevin Jovanovic, M.D. on 7/23/2019 at 6:30 p.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants' Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Annette Bacon for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. V. Alexander Garcias on 5/6/2019 at 12:00 p.m. EDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. V. Alexander Garcias on 5/6/2019 at 11:00 a.m. EDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. V. Alexander Garcias on 5/9/2019 at 11:00 a.m. EDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cheryl Annette Bacon for Response to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admission and Requests for Production. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Cheryl Annette Bacon on 05/02/2019 at 9:00 a.m. EDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Ethicon, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production to Plaintiff by Ethicon, Inc. (Walker, Caroline) (Modified on 3/12/2019 to convert event to Certificate of Service) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Margaret H. Loveman on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Loveman, Margaret) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Caroline Dye Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc.. (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lee B. Balefsky on behalf of Cheryl Annette Bacon. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Cheryl Annette Bacon to Substitute Lee Balefsky and Christine Clarke as Counsel in lieu of Howard L. Nations (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER Having been advised by counsel that in the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A, the plaintiffs and Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, and where named, Ethicon, LLC have agreed to a mutual stay of activity. The Court finds it unnecessary to conduct further proceedings or to keep these cases on the active docket and ORDERS as follows: 1) all discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the Court, 2) the Clerk is directed to retire each of the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A from the active docket, 3) any case listed on Exhibit A that has not been dismissed or does not have a motion to reinstate to the active docket filed with the court for consideration by 3/31/2018 will be reinstated to the active docket by order of the court with a shortened Docket Control Order. This Order is linked to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5045. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/16/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
June 17, 2017 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Cheryl Annette Bacon. (Nations, Howard) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 30, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 19, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 95 (AGREED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF ADDITIONAL COOK ENTITIES IN ALL CASES) entered on 01/17/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]
January 10, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2893978. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Annette Bacon
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky
Represented By: Christine V. Clarke
Represented By: Eric Scott Fredrickson
Represented By: Matthew Scott Harman
Represented By: Benjamin O. Present
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Caroline D. Walker
Represented By: Margaret H. Loveman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: David F. Norden
Represented By: Caroline D. Walker
Represented By: Halli Dee Cohn
Represented By: Margaret H. Loveman
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: David F. Norden
Represented By: Caroline D. Walker
Represented By: Halli Dee Cohn
Represented By: Margaret H. Loveman
Represented By: S. Eric Rumanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?